EP3038872 - AIR DRYER ASSEMBLY WITH MANIFOLD SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haldex Brake Products Corporation 10930 North Pomona Avenue Kansas City, Missouri 64153 / US | [2016/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADAMS, Andrew, W. 1525 NE Neawanna Drive Lee's Summit, MO 64086 / US | 02 /
JENKINS, Michael, R. 8204 NW 76th Terrace Kansas City, MO 64152 / US | [2016/27] | Representative(s) | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB (Muc) Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/44] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2016/27] | Börner, Robert Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 14840377.7 | 29.08.2014 | [2016/27] | WO2014US53337 | Priority number, date | US201314014689 | 30.08.2013 Original published format: US201314014689 | [2016/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015031713 | Date: | 05.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3038872 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3038872 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3038872 | Date: | 17.07.2024 | [2024/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.03.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60T17/00, B01D53/26, B01D53/04 | [2017/21] | CPC: |
B01D53/261 (EP,US);
B60T17/004 (US);
B01D53/0446 (EP,US);
F16L41/005 (EP,US);
F16L41/03 (EP,US);
B01D2257/702 (EP,US);
B01D2257/80 (EP,US);
B01D2258/06 (EP,US);
B01D2259/402 (EP,US);
B01D2259/4566 (US);
B01D53/002 (EP,US);
B01D53/265 (EP,US);
Y10T137/85938 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/27] | B60T17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LUFTTROCKNERANORDNUNG MIT VERTEILERSYSTEM | [2016/27] | English: | AIR DRYER ASSEMBLY WITH MANIFOLD SYSTEM | [2016/27] | French: | ENSEMBLE SÉCHEUR D'AIR À SYSTÈME DE COLLECTEUR | [2016/27] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 03.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/27] | 08.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.11.2023 | CZ | 01.11.2023 | DK | 01.11.2023 | EE | 01.11.2023 | ES | 01.11.2023 | HR | 01.11.2023 | IT | 01.11.2023 | LT | 01.11.2023 | LV | 01.11.2023 | NL | 01.11.2023 | PL | 01.11.2023 | RO | 01.11.2023 | RS | 01.11.2023 | SE | 01.11.2023 | SK | 01.11.2023 | SM | 01.11.2023 | BG | 01.02.2024 | NO | 01.02.2024 | GR | 02.02.2024 | IS | 01.03.2024 | PT | 01.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
CZ | 01.11.2023 | ||
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RO | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 01.11.2023 | |
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 02.02.2024 | |
IS | 01.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4113451 (FRANTZ VIRGIL L); | [A]EP1136447 (BARNSTEAD THERMOLYNE CORP [US]); | [A]US2006288869 (WARREN JOHN L [CA], et al); | [XI]US2009038479 (HUBERLAND FILIP GUSTAAF M [BE]) | International search | [Y]US3967838 (LEGRIS ANDRE); | [X]US5715621 (MITSCH MATTHEW D [US]); | [A]US6581297 (GINDER WILLIAM F [US]); | [Y]US7097696 (SALZMAN MONTE [US], et al) | Examination | FR1202530 | DE1853043U | EP2407231 | by applicant | FR1202530 | DE1853043U | US2009038479 | EP2407231 |