EP3040045 - MEDICAL MANIPULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.12.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2016/27] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KISHI, Kosuke c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2017/09] |
Former [2016/41] | 01 /
KISHI, Kosuke c/o Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | ||
Former [2016/27] | 01 /
KISHI, Kosuke c/o OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Representative(s) | Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/27] | Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14840515.2 | 15.08.2014 | [2016/27] | WO2014JP71488 | Priority number, date | JP20130175044 | 26.08.2013 Original published format: JP 2013175044 | [2016/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015029804 | Date: | 05.03.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3040045 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.03.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B34/00, A61B34/30, A61B34/37 | [2017/16] | CPC: |
A61B34/71 (EP,US);
A61B34/30 (EP,US);
A61B34/37 (EP,US);
A61B2034/305 (EP,US);
A61B2034/715 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/27] | A61B90/00, B25J3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/27] | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHER MANIPULATOR | [2016/27] | English: | MEDICAL MANIPULATOR | [2016/27] | French: | MANIPULATEUR MÉDICAL | [2016/27] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2016 | Translation filed | 09.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/27] | 20.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/04] | 17.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US5807377 (MADHANI AKHIL J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6 * column 11, line 39 - line 53; figure 6 * [A] 5,13 [Y] 7-12,14 [I] 3; | [X]US5876325 (MIZUNO HITOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6 * column 46, line 46 - line 63; figures 67a,67b *; | [Y]US2004199147 (NISHIZAWA KOUJI [JP], et al) [Y] 7,8,10-12,14 * figures 1,3,7,8 *; | [Y]US2010228283 (JINNO MAKOTO [JP]) [Y] 9 * figure 29 * | International search | [X]JPH07136173 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [Y]JP2004122286 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JP2009028425 (TERUMO CORP, et al); | [A]JP2004105283 (OLYMPUS CORP) | by applicant | JP5042738B |