EP3039736 - BIPOLAR SOLID STATE BATTERY INSULATING PACKAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2020 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/18] |
Former [2019/21] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2016/27] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHRISTENSEN, John, F. 555 Middlefield Road M312 Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 02 /
SCHUMANN, Bernd Hegelstrasse 34 71277 Rutesheim / DE | 03 /
LOHMANN, Timm 555 Middlefield Road L203 Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2016/27] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2019/21] |
Former [2016/27] | Bee, Joachim Robert Bosch GmbH, C/IPE P.O. Box 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 14840694.5 | 27.08.2014 | [2016/27] | WO2014US52893 | Priority number, date | US201361870836P | 28.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361870836 P | [2016/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015031469 | Date: | 05.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3039736 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3039736 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.03.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/04, H01M10/058, H01M2/02, H01M10/653, H01M10/6567 | [2019/07] | CPC: |
H01M10/625 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/653 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0418 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/052 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0562 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0585 (KR);
H01M10/617 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/6555 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/656 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/116 (KR);
H01M50/124 (EP,KR,US);
H01M2220/20 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/15] | H01M10/04, H01M10/058, H01M2/02, H01M10/65, H01M10/0562 | ||
Former IPC [2016/27] | H01M10/04, H01M10/058, H01M2/02, H01M10/65 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ISOLIERGEHÄUSE FÜR BIPOLARE FESTSTOFFBATTERIE | [2016/27] | English: | BIPOLAR SOLID STATE BATTERY INSULATING PACKAGE | [2016/27] | French: | CONDITIONNEMENT ISOLANT DE BATTERIE BIPOLAIRE À ÉLECTROLYTE SOLIDE | [2016/27] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/27] | 13.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.08.2014 | AL | 22.05.2019 | AT | 22.05.2019 | CY | 22.05.2019 | CZ | 22.05.2019 | DK | 22.05.2019 | EE | 22.05.2019 | ES | 22.05.2019 | FI | 22.05.2019 | HR | 22.05.2019 | IT | 22.05.2019 | LT | 22.05.2019 | LV | 22.05.2019 | MC | 22.05.2019 | MK | 22.05.2019 | MT | 22.05.2019 | NL | 22.05.2019 | PL | 22.05.2019 | RO | 22.05.2019 | RS | 22.05.2019 | SE | 22.05.2019 | SI | 22.05.2019 | SK | 22.05.2019 | SM | 22.05.2019 | TR | 22.05.2019 | BG | 22.08.2019 | NO | 22.08.2019 | GR | 23.08.2019 | IE | 27.08.2019 | LU | 27.08.2019 | BE | 31.08.2019 | CH | 31.08.2019 | LI | 31.08.2019 | IS | 22.09.2019 | PT | 22.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 27.08.2014 | |
AL | 22.05.2019 | ||
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
MT | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IE | 27.08.2019 | ||
LU | 27.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
IS | 22.09.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 27.08.2014 | |
AL | 22.05.2019 | ||
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IE | 27.08.2019 | ||
LU | 27.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
IS | 22.09.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IE | 27.08.2019 | ||
LU | 27.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
IS | 22.09.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IE | 27.08.2019 | ||
LU | 27.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IE | 27.08.2019 | ||
LU | 27.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IE | 27.08.2019 | ||
LU | 27.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
LU | 27.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 22.05.2019 | |
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 22.05.2019 | |
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JP2006261009 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 6,7 * Subject of the invention; paragraph [0020] * [A] 9-12; | [X]WO2007060910 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,13,14 * figure 7 *; | [X]JP2008186595 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1-3,13,14 * paragraphs [0015] , [0 17] , [0 21] , [0 22] , [0 41]; figures 3,4 *; | [YA]CN101510593 (AOKUI XU [CN]) [Y] 8,17-20 * figure 1; claims 1,2 *[A] 9-12; | [XAY]JP2009193729 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,2,4,5,13-16 * paragraphs [0020] , [0 49] - [0055]; figure 1 * [A] 9-12 [Y] 6-8,17-20 | International search | [A]JPH08255615 (NIPPON DENSO CO); | [X]JP2009252548 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2010034002 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO); | [Y]US2011287292 (SUYAMA HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [A]WO2012105160 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2008186595 | JP2009193729 | JP2009252548 |