EP3044771 - MONITORING DEVICE AND METHOD OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.04.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.05.2018 [2018/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Soil IQ, Inc. 405 15th Street Oakland, CA 94612 / US | [2016/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARAMBURU, Jason 405 15th Street Oakland, CA 94612 / US | [2016/29] | Representative(s) | Stanners, David Ralph, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Altius House 1 North Fourth Street Milton Keynes MK9 1NE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/29] | Stanners, David Ralph, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP The Podium 1 Eversholt Street London NW1 2DN / GB | Application number, filing date | 14842545.7 | 09.09.2014 | [2016/29] | WO2014US54742 | Priority number, date | US201361875579P | 09.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361875579 P | [2016/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015035370 | Date: | 12.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3044771 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.03.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A01G25/16 | [2017/18] | CPC: |
A01G25/167 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2016/29] | G08B23/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/29] | Title | German: | ÜBERWACHUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG | [2016/29] | English: | MONITORING DEVICE AND METHOD OF USE | [2016/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION | [2016/29] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/29] | 10.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/19] | 18.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2009007706 (HITT DALE K [US], et al) [X] 9,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0027] , [0 43] , [0 45] - [0047] - [0 50] , [0 63] , [0 78] - [0079] - [0 81] , [0 86] , [0 90] - [0096] * [Y] 1-4,8,10,12,13; | [Y]CN103063471 (INST AGRICULTURAL RESOURCES & ENVIRONMENT SHANDONG ACADEMY AGRICULTURAL SCIENCES) [Y] 1-4,8 * abstract *; | [YA]US2004140902 (STAPLES PETER ETHAN [US]) [Y] 10,12,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0030] - [0032] - [0 47] * [A] 1-8,14,15; | [A]WO2010093234 (MIMOS BHD [MY], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 6, line 22 - page 7, line 15 *; | [A]US2006178847 (GLANCY JOHN E [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0006] * | International search | [Y]US2009007706 (HITT DALE K [US], et al); | [Y]US2004140902 (STAPLES PETER ETHAN [US]); | [A]US2007157512 (WEIN REINHOLD [CH], et al); | [A]US2004238217 (BUSS PETER [AU], et al); | [A]US2009025287 (LEE YU MEI [US]); | [A]US2012109387 (MARTIN TOMMY J [US], et al) |