EP3041405 - APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF PATTERNS OF NERVOUS SYSTEM ACTIVITY AFFECTING DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tylerton International Inc. Nerine Chambers P.O. Box 905 Road Town Tortola / VG | [2016/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEN-HAIM, Shlomo c/o Lemuria Alliance SA 17 Rue des Pierres-du-Niton 1207 Geneva / CH | [2016/28] | Representative(s) | Korenberg, Alexander Tal, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/28] | Korenberg, Alexander Tal, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14842815.4 | 08.09.2014 | [2016/28] | WO2014IB64319 | Priority number, date | US201361875070P | 08.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361875070 P | US201361875069P | 08.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361875069 P | US201361875074P | 08.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361875074 P | US201461925670P | 10.01.2014 Original published format: US 201461925670 P | US201461925669P | 10.01.2014 Original published format: US 201461925669 P | WO2014IL50086 | 24.01.2014 Original published format: PCT/IL2014/050086 | WO2014IL50088 | 24.01.2014 Original published format: PCT/IL2014/050088 | WO2014IL50089 | 24.01.2014 Original published format: PCT/IL2014/050089 | WO2014IL50090 | 24.01.2014 Original published format: PCT/IL2014/050090 | WO2014IL50246 | 11.03.2014 Original published format: PCT/IL2014/050246 | US201462003108P | 27.05.2014 Original published format: US 201462003108 P | US201462030740P | 30.07.2014 Original published format: US 201462030740 P | US201462030972P | 30.07.2014 Original published format: US 201462030972 P | US201462030917P | 30.07.2014 Original published format: US 201462030917 P | [2016/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015033319 | Date: | 12.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3041405 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [2016/28] | CPC: |
G06T7/0012 (EP,US);
A61N2/006 (US);
A61B6/037 (US);
A61B6/506 (US);
A61N2/02 (US);
G06T7/0014 (US);
A61B2018/00577 (US);
A61B34/10 (US);
G06T2207/10072 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10076 (US);
G06T2207/30016 (US);
G06T2207/30048 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30092 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/28] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR DIAGNOSE UND BEHANDLUNG VON MUSTERN EINER DIE NERVENSYSTEMAKTIVITÄT BEEINFLUSSENDEN KRANKHEIT | [2016/28] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF PATTERNS OF NERVOUS SYSTEM ACTIVITY AFFECTING DISEASE | [2016/28] | French: | L'INVENTION CONCERNE DES APPAREILS ET DES PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT DE DIAGNOSTIQUER ET DE TRAITER DES MODÈLES D'UNE MALADIES AFFECTANT L'ACTIVITÉ DU SYSTÈME NERVEUX | [2016/28] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/28] | 17.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/34] | 16.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - T. HIGUCHI ET AL, "Assessment of the 18F-Labeled PET Tracer LMI1195 for Imaging Norepinephrine Handling in Rat Hearts", THE JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, US, (20130513), vol. 54, no. 7, pages 1142 - 1146, XP055374267 [X] 1-11 * page 1142, column l, paragraph l - column r, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2967/jnumed.112.104232 | [X] - ORNELLA RIMOLDI, "Assessing the activity of cardiac sympathetic innervation with a novel PET tracer", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE AND MOLECULAR IMAGING, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20121019), vol. 39, no. 12, pages 1901 - 1903, XP035136073 [X] 1-11 * page 1901, column r, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00259-012-2264-z | International search | [A]US6490480 (LERNER EDUARD [NL]); | [A]US2007106337 (ERRICO JOSEPH P [US], et al); | [X]US7363076 (YUN ANTHONY JOONKYOO [US], et al); | [A]US2011152974 (REZAI ALI [US], et al); | [A]US2011306846 (OSORIO IVAN [US]) |