EP3044317 - ANTISENSE OLIGOMERS AND METHODS FOR TREATING SMN-RELATED PATHOLOGIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University Of Western Australia 35 Stirling Highway Crawley, WA 6009 / AU | [2016/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILTON, Stephen Donald 18 Spey Road Applecross, Western Australia 6153 / AU | 02 /
FLETCHER, Sue 14 Roberts Street Bayswater, Western Australia 6053 / AU | 03 /
PRICE, Loren Louise 132 Daglish Street Wembley, Western Australia 6014 / AU | 04 /
MITRPANT, Chalermchai 444/57 Charoenkrung 85 Charoenkrung Road Wat Phrayakrai Bangkholam 10120 Bangkok / TH | [2016/29] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/29] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 14844805.3 | 12.09.2014 | [2016/29] | WO2014AU00907 | Priority number, date | AU20130903524 | 13.09.2013 Original published format: AU 2013903524 | [2016/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015035460 | Date: | 19.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3044317 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 19.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, C07H21/00, A61K31/712, A61K31/7125, A61P21/00, A61P25/02 | [2016/29] | CPC: |
A61K31/712 (EP,US);
A61K31/7125 (EP,US);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12N15/111 (EP,US);
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
C12N2310/11 (EP,US);
C12N2310/31 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/29] | Title | German: | ANTISENSE-OLIGOMERE UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON PATHLOGIEN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT SMN | [2016/29] | English: | ANTISENSE OLIGOMERS AND METHODS FOR TREATING SMN-RELATED PATHOLOGIES | [2016/29] | French: | OLIGOMÈRES ANTISENS ET PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT DE PATHOLOGIES LIÉES À SMN | [2016/29] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/29] | 18.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2013086207 (UNIV OHIO STATE [US], et al); | [L]SG189598 (SINGAPORE HEALTH SERV PTE LTD [SG]) | [X] - MITRPANT, C. ET AL., "Improved antisense oligonucleotide design to suppress aberrant SMN2 gene transcript processing: towards a treatment for spinal muscular atrophy", PLOS ONE, (201304), vol. 8, no. ISSUE, XP002733112 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0062114 | [X] - ZHOU, H. ET AL., "A novel morpholino oligomer targeting ISS-N1 improves rescue of severe spinal muscular atrophy transgenic mice", HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (201303), vol. 24, pages 1 - 12, XP055324641 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/hum.2012.211 | [X] - HUA, Y. ET AL., "Antisense masking of an hnRNP A1/A2 intronic splicing silencer corrects SMN2 splicing in transgenic mice", THE AMERICAN JOURNAL OF HUMAN GENETICS, (2008), vol. 82, pages 834 - 848, XP055274438 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1098/rsob.120133 |