EP3046507 - GRAFT DEVICES WITH SPINES AND RELATED SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neograft Technologies, Inc. 470 Constitution Drive Taunton, MA 02780 / US | [2016/39] |
Former [2016/30] | For all designated states Neograft Technologies Inc. 470 Constitution Drive Taunton, MA 02780 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOLETTI, Lorenzo 217 Vine Street Pittsburgh, PA 15218 / US | 02 /
SPIRIDIGLIOZZI, John 9 W Broadway 609 Boston, MA 02127 / US | 03 /
EL-KURDI, Mohammed, S. 12 Darby Drive Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | 04 /
MCGRATH, Jon 16 Bayberry Lane Duxbury, MA 02332 / US | 05 /
FLAHERTY, J., Christopher 2122 Kirkland Lake Drive Auburndale, FL 33823 / US | [2016/41] |
Former [2016/30] | 01 /
SOLETTI, Lorenzo 217 Vine Street Pittsburgh, PA 15218 / US | ||
02 /
SPIRIDIGLIOZZI, John 9 W Broadway 609 Boston, MA 02127 / US | |||
03 /
EL-KURDI, Mohammed, S. 792 West Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | |||
04 /
MCGRATH, Jon 16 Bayberry Lane Duxbury, MA 02332 / US | |||
05 /
FLAHERTY, J., Christopher 2122 Kirkland Lake Drive Auburndale, FL 33823 / US | Representative(s) | Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 JJ Thomson Avenue Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/30] | Cummings, Ross Martin, et al Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 J.J. Thomson Avenue Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | Application number, filing date | 14845431.7 | 18.09.2014 | [2016/30] | WO2014US56371 | Priority number, date | US201361880550P | 20.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361880550 P | [2016/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015042298 | Date: | 26.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3046507 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.03.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06, A61F2/82, A61L27/50, A61F2/07, A61F2/88, D01D5/00 | [2017/11] | CPC: |
A61F2/06 (EP,US);
A61F2/07 (US);
A61L27/507 (EP,US);
A61F2/885 (EP,US);
A61F2002/072 (EP,US);
D01D5/0007 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/30] | A61F2/06, A61F2/82 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/30] | Title | German: | TRANSPLANTATVORRICHTUNGEN MIT DORNEN SOWIE ENTSPRECHENDE SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN | [2016/30] | English: | GRAFT DEVICES WITH SPINES AND RELATED SYSTEMS AND METHODS | [2016/30] | French: | GREFFONS ARTIFICIELS POURVUS DE STRUCTURES DE SUPPORT ET SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS APPARENTÉS | [2016/30] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2016 | Search fee paid | 11.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/30] | 14.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/12] | 30.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9529647 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,7-15 * page 9, line 27 - line 30; figures 2,4,7,12 * * page 10, line 11 - line 15 * * page 13, line 14 - line 16 * [I] 3-6; | [A]WO0009041 (BOSTON SCIENT SCIMED INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 10, line 20 - page 11, line 12 ** page 12, line 24 - line 25 *; | [A]US6475232 (BABBS CHARLES F [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 8, line 55 - column 10, line 11; figures 1, 3a, 5b * | International search | [A]US6077217 (LOVE CHARLES S [US], et al); | [Y]US2006136041 (SCHMID ERIC V [US], et al); | [A]US2006257447 (HINDS MONICA [US], et al); | [A]US2011288628 (NOESNER MATTHEW [US], et al); | [X]WO2013123147 (NEOGRAFT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) |