EP3047438 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR SCREENING ELECTRONIC MONEY TRANSFER TRANSACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.07.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mastercard International, Inc. 2000 Purchase Street Purchase, NY 10577 / US | [2016/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIMBERG, Deborah 1043 Nooning Tree Drive Chesterfield, Missouri 63017 / US | 02 /
HAGMEIER, Shawn Eric 510 Greenbriar Downs Drive St. Peters, Missouri 63376 / US | 03 /
REED, Derek Ryan 1278 Summer Lynne Drive O'Fallon, Missouri 63366 / US | [2016/30] | Representative(s) | Fountain, Sullivan, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2016/30] | Application number, filing date | 14845819.3 | 15.09.2014 | [2016/30] | WO2014US55662 | Priority number, date | US201361879463P | 18.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361879463 P | US201414479610 | 08.09.2014 Original published format: US201414479610 | [2016/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015041982 | Date: | 26.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3047438 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.03.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/40, G06Q20/10 | [2016/30] | CPC: |
G06Q20/4016 (EP,RU,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/30] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUM SCREENING VON ELEKTRONISCHEN GELDÜBERTRAGUNGSTRANSAKTIONEN | [2016/30] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR SCREENING ELECTRONIC MONEY TRANSFER TRANSACTIONS | [2016/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES DE SURVEILLANCE DE TRANSACTIONS ÉLECTRONIQUES DE TRANSFERT D'ARGENT | [2016/30] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2016 | Search fee paid | 15.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/30] | 21.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.03.2019 | 14.03.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/34] | 12.04.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US7801811 (MERRELL DANIEL JAMES [US], et al); | [X]US2011270756 (TULLIS JOHN [US], et al); | [A]US2012330689 (MCLAUGHLIN THOMAS J [US], et al); | [Y]US2013018796 (KOLHATKAR JAYASHREE S [US], et al); | [A]US2013132275 (ENZALDO ROBERT [US], et al) |