EP3048481 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE, METHOD FOR CONTROLLING ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Solution Innovators, Ltd. 18-7 Shinkiba 1-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 136-8627 / JP | [2016/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAO, Yusuke c/o NEC Solution Innovators Ltd. 1-18-7 Shinkiba Koto-ku Tokyo 136-8627 / JP | [2016/30] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2016/30] | Application number, filing date | 14846345.8 | 03.09.2014 | [2016/30] | WO2014JP04521 | Priority number, date | JP20130194995 | 20.09.2013 Original published format: JP 2013194995 | [2016/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015040809 | Date: | 26.03.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3048481 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.03.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G03B17/38, G03B15/00, H04M1/00, H04N5/225, // G06F3/01 | [2017/19] | CPC: |
G03B17/38 (EP,US);
G06F3/017 (EP,US);
G06F1/1686 (EP);
G06F1/1694 (EP);
G06F3/0346 (US);
H04N23/60 (EP,US);
G03B2217/005 (EP,US);
G06F2200/1636 (EP);
H04M2250/12 (EP,US);
H04M2250/52 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/30] | G03B17/38, G03B15/00, H04M1/00, H04N5/225 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/30] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER ELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNG UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2016/30] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE, METHOD FOR CONTROLLING ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2016/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2016/30] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2016 | Translation filed | 31.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/30] | 09.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/20] | 19.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2010256947 (KIM DONG YOON [US], et al) [I] 1-10* paragraph [0007]; figure 2 *; | [I]JP2011075831 (CANON KK) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0012] , [0 13] , [0 14]; figures 8b, 9 *; | [I]JP2011101155 (OLYMPUS IMAGING CORP) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0036] - [0049]; figures 6,7 *; | [I]US2011128431 (BANG HYO-SANG [KR]) [I] 1-10 * paragraph [0067]; figures 5, 7 * | International search | [A]JP2009033566 (FUJIFILM CORP); | [A]JP2009302808 (OLYMPUS IMAGING CORP); | [A]JP2010268112 (OLYMPUS IMAGING CORP); | [X]JP2011075831 (CANON KK); | [X]JP2011101155 (OLYMPUS IMAGING CORP); | [X]JP2011237716 (OLYMPUS IMAGING CORP) | by applicant | JP2013172282 |