EP3048109 - NOVEL ANTIBODY PURIFICATION METHOD AND ANTIBODY OBTAINED THEREFROM, AND NOVEL ANTIBODY PURIFICATION METHOD USING CATION EXCHANGER AND ANTIBODY OBTAINED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2021 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kaneka Corporation 2-3-18, Nakanoshima Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | [2016/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MINAKUCHI, Kazunobu c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8 Takasagocho Miyamaecho Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-8688 / JP | [2016/30] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/30] | Application number, filing date | 14846521.4 | 16.09.2014 | [2016/30] | WO2014JP74452 | Priority number, date | JP20130192378 | 17.09.2013 Original published format: JP 2013192378 | JP20130192379 | 17.09.2013 Original published format: JP 2013192379 | [2016/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015041218 | Date: | 26.03.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3048109 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.03.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/18, C07K1/22, C07K16/00 | [2016/30] | CPC: |
C07K16/00 (EP,US);
C07K1/22 (US);
C07K1/36 (EP,US);
C07K16/1271 (US);
C07K2317/55 (US);
C07K2317/622 (US);
C07K2317/626 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/30] | Title | German: | NEUARTIGES ANTIKÖRPERAUFREINIGUNGSVERFAHREN UND ANTIKÖRPER DARAUS SOWIE NEUARTIGES ANTIKÖRPERAUFREINIGUNGSVERFAHREN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES KATIONENAUSTAUSCHERS UND ANTIKÖRPER DARAUS | [2016/30] | English: | NOVEL ANTIBODY PURIFICATION METHOD AND ANTIBODY OBTAINED THEREFROM, AND NOVEL ANTIBODY PURIFICATION METHOD USING CATION EXCHANGER AND ANTIBODY OBTAINED THEREFROM | [2016/30] | French: | NOUVEAU PROCÉDÉ DE PURIFICATION D'ANTICORPS ET ANTICORPS OBTENU AU MOYEN DE CE PROCÉDÉ, NOUVEAU PROCÉDÉ DE PURIFICATION D'ANTICORPS À L'AIDE D'UN ÉCHANGEUR DE CATIONS ET ANTICORPS OBTENU AU MOYEN DE CE PROCÉDÉ | [2016/30] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2016 | Translation filed | 17.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/30] | 22.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/10] | 16.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2027921 (MILLIPORE CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,6,18 * claims 7, 10 *; | [X]WO2009058769 (SCHERING CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,18* claims 1, 2, 6 *; | [X]WO2010141039 (ABBOTT LAB [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,18 * claims 1, 3, 5, 6 *; | [XI]WO2011017514 (MILLIPORE CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,9,16,18 * examples 4, 8, 9; claims 18-21 * [I] 5,8,10-15,17; | [X]WO2011050071 (ABBOTT LAB [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,18 * claims 1, 5, 6 * | International search | [A]JP2002522779 (ZYCOS, INC.); | [A]JP2008505851 (GE HEALTHCARE BIO-SCIENCES AB.); | [X]JP2008542218 (F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG.); | [Y]JP2012530088 (F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG.); | [Y]JP2013501721 (EMD MILLIPORE CORP.); | [AP]WO2014034457 (KANEKA CORP [JP]); | [Y] - TAKEO YAMABE ET AL., "Kongo Ion Kokan Column ni yoru Amino Acid no Gunbunri", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (1968), vol. 89, no. 8, pages 772 - 775, XP008182976 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1246/nikkashi1948.89.8_772 | [Y] - HOU, C. ET AL., "Weak anion and cation exchange mixed-bed microcolumn for protein separation", J. SEP. SCI., (2010), vol. 33, pages 3299 - 3303, XP055326690 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jssc.201000440 | by applicant | US3932557 | US4210723 | US4772653 | JPH05202098 | US5250613 | US5260373 | JPH06228200 | US5874165 | US6399750 | EP1352957 | WO2004074471 | WO2008085988 | JP2008535913 | JP4391830B | WO2010019493 | JP2010507583 | JP2010510963 | JP2010133733 | JP2010133734 | WO2010141039 | WO2011017514 | JP2011256176 | - HOBER S. ET AL., J. CHROMATOGR. B, (2007), vol. 848, pages 40 - 47 | - LOW D. ET AL., J. CHROMATOGR. B, (2007), vol. 848, pages 48 - 63 | - ROQUE A. C. A. ET AL., J. CHROMATOGR. A, (2007), vol. 1160, pages 44 - 55 | - LJUNGQUIST C. ET AL., EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1989), vol. 186, pages 557 - 561 |