EP3048894 - METHOD OF PREPARING A BIVALVE MOLLUSC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fisheries Research and Development Corporation 25 Geils Court (P.O. Box 222) Deakin West, Australian Capital Territory 2600 / AU | [2016/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAHL, Stephen Luke 11 Thompson Court Mount Barker, South Australia 5251 / AU | 02 /
SIMMONDS, Robert 1 Muhlhan Avenue Windsor Gardens, South Australia 5087 / AU | [2016/31] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2016/31] | Application number, filing date | 14846797.0 | 22.09.2014 | [2016/31] | WO2014AU00928 | Priority number, date | AU20130903723 | 26.09.2013 Original published format: AU 2013903723 | [2016/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015042638 | Date: | 02.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3048894 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 02.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A22C29/04, A47G21/06 | [2016/31] | CPC: |
A22C29/046 (EP,US);
A23L17/50 (EP,US);
A47G21/065 (EP,US);
A47G21/067 (US);
A47G21/068 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ZWEISCHALIGEN MOLLUSKEN | [2016/31] | English: | METHOD OF PREPARING A BIVALVE MOLLUSC | [2016/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UN MOLLUSQUE BIVALVE | [2016/31] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2016 | Search fee paid | 22.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/31] | 17.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/39] | 28.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]FR2622400 (LAUGRAUD BERNARD [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,11-13 * page 2, line 15 - page 4, line 5 * [I] 3,7,9,10,14,15; | [XI]FR2739539 (BOULLIER EDITH [FR]) [X] 1,2,4-6,11-15 * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 6; figure - * [I] 3,7; | [XI]FR2745484 (DAUBIN BERNARD [FR]) [X] 1,2,4-6,11-15 * page 4, line 8 - page 9, line 17; figure - *[I] 3,7; | [XI]FR2754694 (SARL OSTRAQUICK [FR]) [X] 1,2,4-6,11-15 * page 5, line 14 - page 7, line 37; figure - * [I] 3,7; | [XI]FR2760343 (BOULLIER EDITH [FR]) [X] 1,2,4-6,11-15 * page 4, line 7 - page 5, line 3; figure - * [I] 3,7; | [XI]FR2781658 (PITOUX JACQUES [FR]) [X] 1,2,4-6,11-15 * page 2, line 19 - page 4, line 2; figure - * [I] 3,7; | [XI]WO2006123395 (MATSUKI EIICHI [JP]) [X] 1-7,11-15 * the whole document * [I] 8-10; | [XI]JP2008161065 (URABE TOSHIRO) [X] 1,2,4-6,11-15 * the whole document * [I] 3,7-10; | [XI]FR2955742 (LAFON PATRICK [FR]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,11-13 * page 2, line 20 - page 6, line 29; figure - * [I] 3,7,9,10,14,15 | International search | [X]FR2406981 (NICOLAS RENE [FR]); | [X]JPH0759508 (SASAKI RYOJI, et al); | [X]FR2901962 (LAFON PATRICK [FR]); | [XP]FR2991155 (COUTELLERIE CULINAIRE ROUSSEAU ATEL [FR]) |