EP3053949 - COMPOSITE RESIN PRE-EXPANDED PARTICLES CONTAINING CARBON BLACK AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, AND EXPANDED MOLDED ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sekisui Plastics Co., Ltd. 4-4, Nishi-tenma 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0047 / JP | [2016/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISAYAMA, Akira c/o SEKISUI PLASTICS CO. LTD. 1259 Minakuchicho Izumi Koka-shi Shiga 528-0056 / JP | 02 /
OZAWA, Masahiko c/o SEKISUI PLASTICS CO. LTD. 1259 Minakuchicho Izumi Koka-shi Shiga 528-0056 / JP | [2016/32] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/32] | Application number, filing date | 14846852.3 | 11.09.2014 | [2016/32] | WO2014JP74087 | Priority number, date | JP20130205307 | 30.09.2013 Original published format: JP 2013205307 | JP20140069217 | 28.03.2014 Original published format: JP 2014069217 | [2016/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015045885 | Date: | 02.04.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3053949 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3053949 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/00, C08J9/18, C08K3/04, C08L25/06, C08L23/08, // C08J9/14, C08J9/232 | [2017/22] | CPC: |
C08J9/0066 (EP,KR,US);
C08J9/18 (EP,KR,US);
C08J9/0014 (EP,US);
C08J9/0019 (EP,KR,US);
C08J9/0028 (EP,US);
C08J9/0033 (EP,US);
C08J9/0061 (EP,KR,US);
C08J9/0095 (EP,KR,US);
C08J9/141 (EP,KR,US);
C08J9/22 (US);
C08J9/232 (EP,KR,US);
C08J9/34 (KR);
C08K3/04 (KR);
C08J2201/034 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2203/14 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2203/182 (EP,US);
C08J2325/06 (EP,US);
C08J2423/06 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/32] | C08J9/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RUSS ENTHALTENDE, VOREXPANDIERTE VERBUNDHARZPARTIKEL UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG, SOWIE EXPANDIERTER FORMARTIKEL | [2018/52] | English: | COMPOSITE RESIN PRE-EXPANDED PARTICLES CONTAINING CARBON BLACK AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, AND EXPANDED MOLDED ARTICLE | [2016/32] | French: | PARTICULES PRÉ-EXPANSÉES DE RÉSINE COMPOSITE CONTENANT DU NOIR DE CARBONE ET LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION, ET ARTICLE EXPANSÉ MOULÉ | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/32] | VORGEDEHNTE VERBUNDHARZPARTIKEL MIT RUSS UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON SOWIE GEDEHNTER FORMARTIKEL | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2016 | Translation filed | 17.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/32] | 24.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.09.2014 | AL | 15.05.2019 | AT | 15.05.2019 | CY | 15.05.2019 | CZ | 15.05.2019 | DK | 15.05.2019 | EE | 15.05.2019 | ES | 15.05.2019 | FI | 15.05.2019 | HR | 15.05.2019 | IT | 15.05.2019 | LT | 15.05.2019 | LV | 15.05.2019 | MC | 15.05.2019 | MK | 15.05.2019 | MT | 15.05.2019 | NL | 15.05.2019 | PL | 15.05.2019 | RO | 15.05.2019 | RS | 15.05.2019 | SE | 15.05.2019 | SI | 15.05.2019 | SK | 15.05.2019 | SM | 15.05.2019 | TR | 15.05.2019 | BG | 15.08.2019 | NO | 15.08.2019 | GR | 16.08.2019 | GB | 11.09.2019 | IE | 11.09.2019 | LU | 11.09.2019 | IS | 15.09.2019 | PT | 15.09.2019 | BE | 30.09.2019 | CH | 30.09.2019 | FR | 30.09.2019 | LI | 30.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 11.09.2014 | |
AL | 15.05.2019 | ||
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
MT | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
GB | 11.09.2019 | ||
IE | 11.09.2019 | ||
LU | 11.09.2019 | ||
IS | 15.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
FR | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 11.09.2014 | |
AL | 15.05.2019 | ||
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
GB | 11.09.2019 | ||
IE | 11.09.2019 | ||
LU | 11.09.2019 | ||
IS | 15.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
FR | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
GB | 11.09.2019 | ||
IE | 11.09.2019 | ||
LU | 11.09.2019 | ||
IS | 15.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
FR | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
GB | 11.09.2019 | ||
IE | 11.09.2019 | ||
LU | 11.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
FR | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
GB | 11.09.2019 | ||
IE | 11.09.2019 | ||
LU | 11.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
FR | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
IE | 11.09.2019 | ||
LU | 11.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
IE | 11.09.2019 | ||
LU | 11.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
LU | 11.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 15.05.2019 | |
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 15.05.2019 | |
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDA]JP2010222546 ; | [XDA] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2010, no. 71, Database accession no. 2010-M74079, XP002769338 & JP2010222546 A 20101007 (SEKISUI PLASTICS CO LTD) [XD] 1,3-6,8-10 * abstract * [A] 2,7 | International search | [A]JP2005506390 (BASF AG.); | [A]JP2010222546 (SEKISUI PLASTICS); | [A]JP2013117037 (SEKISUI PLASTICS) | by applicant | JP2010222546 | JP4917511B |