EP3049874 - CHANGE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM IN A PROCESS CONTROL ARCHITECTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc. 1100 W. Louis Henna Blvd., Bldg 1 Round Rock, TX 78681 / US | [2016/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REYES, Mark Alvin L. 14 Chemistry St. Phase 4D Sto. Niño Bulacan 3020 Meycauayan City / PH | 02 /
WESTBROCK, Jon D. 13150 Crolly Path Rosemount, MN 55068 / US | 03 /
RAMACHANDRAN, Ram 9801 Patrice Drive Austin, TX 78750 / US | [2016/31] | Representative(s) | Parker, Andrew James, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/31] | Parker, Andrew James, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14848305.0 | 24.09.2014 | [2016/31] | WO2014US57179 | Priority number, date | US201361883439P | 27.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361883439 P | [2016/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015048107 | Date: | 02.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3049874 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G05B15/02 | [2017/26] | CPC: |
G05B15/02 (EP,US);
G05B19/41865 (CN);
G06F16/285 (US);
G06F8/65 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/31] | G05B19/418 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/31] | Title | German: | ÄNDERUNGSVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM IN EINER PROZESSSTEUERUNGSARCHITEKTUR | [2016/31] | English: | CHANGE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM IN A PROCESS CONTROL ARCHITECTURE | [2016/31] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE CHANGEMENTS DANS UNE ARCHITECTURE DE COMMANDE DE PROCESSUS | [2016/31] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 10.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/31] | 21.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/32] | 01.04.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008046104 (VAN CAMP KIM O [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XI]EP2189900 (FISHER ROSEMOUNT SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1,7-12,15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0085] * * figures 2-6 * [I] 2-6,13,14; | US2010131084 [ ] (VAN CAMP KIM O [US]); | [A] - Jorge Orchilles, "Hardware devices for Windows 7: Installation, management", Microsoft Windows 7 Administrator's Reference: Upgrading, Deploying, Managing, and Securing Windows 7, (20101001), URL: http://searchitchannel.techtarget.com/feature/Hardware-devices-for-Windows-7-Installation-management, (20170522), XP055375127 [A] 2,3,14 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2006080656 (CAIN NIGEL [US], et al); | [A]US2008046104 (VAN CAMP KIM O [US], et al); | [Y]US2010131084 (VAN CAMP KIM O [US]); | [A]US2010131939 (HIEB BRANDON [US], et al); | [A]US2011078675 (VAN CAMP KIM O [US], et al) |