EP3054447 - VOICE QUALITY EVALUATION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 30.04.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2016/32] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIAO, Wei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2016/32] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/32] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14849044.4 | 05.05.2014 | [2016/32] | WO2014CN76779 | Priority number, date | CN201310462268 | 30.09.2013 Original published format: CN201310462268 | [2016/32] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015043184 | Date: | 02.04.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3054447 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G10L25/60, H04L29/06, H04L12/811 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
G10L25/60 (EP,US);
G10L25/30 (US);
H04L65/80 (EP,US);
H04M3/2236 (EP,US);
G10L19/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/32] | G10L25/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SPRACHQUALITÄTSBEWERTUNG | [2016/32] | English: | VOICE QUALITY EVALUATION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2016/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'ÉVALUATION DE LA QUALITÉ DE VOIX | [2016/32] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2016 | Translation filed | 05.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2016 | Search fee paid | 05.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/32] | 29.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/37] | 12.04.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.04.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012116759 (FOLKESSON MATS [SE], et al) [X] 1,4,7,10 * paragraphs [0059] - [0061] - [0070] *; | [X]EP2525353 (DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG [DE]) [X] 1,7 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0017] *; | [A]US2007286351 (ETHIER RANDALL P J [US], et al) [A] 5,6,11,12 * paragraphs [0019] , [0020] , [0046] - [0048] - [0051] , [0053] , [0055] , [0062] , [0063] *; | [A]US2006221942 (FRUTH FRANK [US], et al) [A] 5,6,11,12 * paragraphs [0032] , [0034] , [0035] , [0042] , [0055] *; | [A]US8503313 (LANG HOWARD [US], et al) [A] 5,6,11,12 * column 5, line 33 - line 46 * * column 6, line 45 - line 58 * * column 7, line 46 - line 65 * * column 9, line 63 - column 10, line 22 * | [XI] - "Speech and multimedia Transmission Quality (STQ); Speech Quality performance in the presence of background noise Part 3: Background noise transmission - Objective test methods", ETSI GUIDE, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE (ETSI), 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS ; FRANCE, (20110201), vol. STQ, no. V1.3.1, XP014061759 [X] 1,2,7,8 * section 6.6.1 * * equations 6.6 and 6.10 * * page 27, line 3 - line 12 * [I] 3,9 | [X] - WERNER M ET AL, "Parameter-based speech quality measures for gsm", PERSONAL, INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS, 2003. PIMRC 2003. 14TH IEEE PROCEEDINGS ON SEPT. 7-10, 2003, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20030907), vol. 2, doi:10.1109/PIMRC.2003.1259200, ISBN 978-0-7803-7822-3, pages 2611 - 2615, XP010678104 [X] 1,7 * section 4 on page 2614, especially equation 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PIMRC.2003.1259200 | [X] - DING ET AL, "Non-intrusive single-ended speech quality assessment in VoIP", SPEECH COMMUNICATION, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20070601), vol. 49, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.SPECOM.2007.04.003, ISSN 0167-6393, pages 477 - 489, XP022113625 [X] 1,7 * section 3.2.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.specom.2007.04.003 | International search | [Y]CN101051942 (YIYANGXINTONG SOFTWARE INST CO [CN]); | [A]US7327985 (MORFITT III JOHN C [US], et al); | [X]CN101188847 (CHINA INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY D [CN]); | [A]CN101727896 (CHUNGHWA TELECOM CORP); | [A]US8140069 (LALL ABHISHEK [US], et al); | [X]CN103152599 (UNIV ZHEJIANG); | [A] - WEI, LI ET AL., "A study of evaluation system of TD-SCDMA custom perception", MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS, (20111231), pages 58 - 65, XP008180355 |