EP3042932 - EPOXY RESIN COMPOSITION FOR USE IN SEALING OF SEMICONDUCTORS, AND SEMICONDUCTOR-PACKAGED STRUCTURE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nagase ChemteX Corporation 1-17, Shin-machi 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-8668 / JP | [2016/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITAGAWA, Takeyuki c/o NAGASE CHEMTEX CORPORATION 236, Nakai, Tatsuno-cho, Tatsuno-shi Hyogo 679-4124 / JP | 02 /
FUJII, Yasuhito c/o NAGASE CHEMTEX CORPORATION 236, Nakai, Tatsuno-cho, Tatsuno-shi Hyogo 679-4124 / JP | 03 /
KAN, Katsushi c/o NAGASE CHEMTEX CORPORATION 236, Nakai, Tatsuno-cho, Tatsuno-shi Hyogo 679-4124 / JP | [2016/29] |
Former [2016/28] | 01 /
KITAGAWA, Takeyuki / JP | ||
02 /
FUJII, Yasuhito / JP | |||
03 /
KAN, Katsushi / JP | Representative(s) | von Bülow & Tamada Rotbuchenstraße 6 81547 München / DE | [2016/28] | Application number, filing date | 14849554.2 | 30.09.2014 | [2016/28] | WO2014JP04986 | Priority number, date | JP20130205074 | 30.09.2013 Original published format: JP 2013205074 | [2016/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015045422 | Date: | 02.04.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3042932 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C08L63/00, C08K3/36, C08K5/00, C08K5/09, H01L23/29, H01L23/31, H01L25/065, H01L25/07, H01L25/18, C08L63/04, C09D163/00 | [2017/17] | CPC: |
H01L25/50 (EP);
C08L63/04 (EP,KR);
C08G59/686 (EP);
C08K3/36 (EP,KR);
C08K5/09 (KR);
C08L63/00 (EP);
C08L83/04 (EP,KR);
C09D163/00 (EP);
H01L23/293 (KR);
H01L23/295 (EP,KR);
H01L23/296 (EP,KR);
H01L24/94 (EP,KR);
H01L24/97 (EP,KR);
H01L25/0657 (EP);
C08K2201/003 (EP,KR);
C08L2203/206 (EP);
H01L2224/0557 (EP);
H01L2224/14181 (EP);
H01L2224/16146 (EP);
H01L2224/32145 (EP);
H01L2224/73204 (EP);
H01L2224/92125 (EP);
H01L2224/94 (EP,KR);
H01L2224/97 (EP);
H01L2225/06513 (EP);
H01L2225/06541 (EP);
H01L2225/06568 (EP);
H01L2924/3511 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L63/00, C08K3/36, C08L63/04, C08L83/04 (EP);
C09D163/00, C08K3/36, C08L63/04, C08L83/04 (EP);
H01L2224/73204, H01L2224/16145, H01L2224/32145, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/94, H01L2224/81 (EP);
H01L2224/94, H01L2224/83 (EP);
H01L2224/97, H01L2224/81 (EP); |
Former IPC [2016/28] | C08L63/00, C08K3/36, C08K5/00, C08K5/09, H01L23/29, H01L23/31, H01L25/065, H01L25/07, H01L25/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/28] | Title | German: | EPOXIDHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUM ABDICHTEN VON HALBLEITERN UND HALBLEITERVERKAPSELTE STRUKTUR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2016/28] | English: | EPOXY RESIN COMPOSITION FOR USE IN SEALING OF SEMICONDUCTORS, AND SEMICONDUCTOR-PACKAGED STRUCTURE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2016/28] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE ÉPOXYDE DESTINÉE À ÊTRE UTILISÉE POUR LE SCELLEMENT DE SEMI-CONDUCTEURS, ET STRUCTURE DE SEMI-CONDUCTEURS EN BOÎTIER ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2016/28] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2016 | Translation filed | 05.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2016 | Search fee paid | 05.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/28] | 09.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/01] | 27.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]JPH1095835 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK); | [Y]WO2009142065 (NAGASE CHEMTEX CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2012069879 (TAIYO HOLDINGS CO LTD); | [Y]JP2013010940 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO); | [AP]JP2013253135 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO) | by applicant | JPS4817847 | JPS5448720 | JP3855074B | JP2011195742 | JP2012209453 | JP2013010940 |