EP3052488 - MACROCYCLIC PICOLINAMIDE COMPOUNDS WITH FUNGICIDAL ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow AgroSciences LLC 9330 Zionsville Road Indianapolis, IN 46268 / US | [2016/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Fangzheng 13989 Wildcat Drive Carmel, IN 46033 / US | 02 /
MEYER, Kevin G. 8942 Windpointe Pass Zionsville, IN 46077 / US | 03 /
RENGA, James M. 703 West 17th Avenue Spokane, WA 99203 / US | 04 /
YAO, Chenglin 14178 Esprit Drive Westfield, IN 46074 / US | 05 /
WILMOT, Jeremy 753 Bloor Woods Court Zionsville, IN 46077 / US | 06 /
HERRICK, Jessica 10695 Long Branch Drive Brownsburg, IN 46112 / US | 07 /
BRAVO-ALTAMIRANO, Karla 12923 Tradd Street Carmel, IN 46032 / US | 08 /
BOEBEL, Timothy A. 5747 North Oxford Street Indianapolis, IN 46220 / US | [2016/38] |
Former [2016/32] | 01 /
LI, Fangzheng 13989 Wildcat Drive Carmel, IN 46033 / US | ||
02 /
MEYER, Kevin G. 100 Lexington Court Zionsville, IN 46077 / US | |||
03 /
RENGA, James M. 703 West 17th Avenue Spokane, WA 99203 / US | |||
04 /
YAO, Chenglin 14178 Esprit Drive Westfield, IN 46074 / US | |||
05 /
WILMOT, Jeremy 753 Bloor Woods Court Zionsville, IN 46077 / US | |||
06 /
HERRICK, Jessica 7110 Westhaven Circle Zionsville, IN 46077 / US | |||
07 /
BRAVO-ALTAMIRANO, Karla 12923 Tradd Street Carmel, IN 46032 / US | |||
08 /
BOEBEL, Timothy A. 5747 North Oxford Street Indianapolis, IN 46220 / US | Representative(s) | f & e patent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/32] | f & e patent Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 14850423.6 | 29.09.2014 | [2016/32] | WO2014US58067 | Priority number, date | US201361885409P | 01.10.2013 Original published format: US 201361885409 P | US201361885417P | 01.10.2013 Original published format: US 201361885417 P | [2016/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015050820 | Date: | 09.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3052488 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07F7/18, A01N43/22, A01N43/40, A01N55/00 | [2017/21] | CPC: |
C07D313/00 (EP,US);
A01N43/04 (US);
A01N43/08 (US);
A01N43/22 (EP,US);
A01N43/40 (EP,US);
A01N43/90 (US);
A01N47/18 (EP,US);
A01N53/00 (US);
A01N55/00 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,US);
C07D407/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/32] | C07D405/12, A01N47/18, A01N43/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/32] | Title | German: | MAKROCYCLISCHE PICOLINAMIDVERBINDUNGEN MIT FUNGIZIDER AKTIVITÄT | [2016/32] | English: | MACROCYCLIC PICOLINAMIDE COMPOUNDS WITH FUNGICIDAL ACTIVITY | [2016/32] | French: | COMPOSÉS DE PICOLINAMIDE MACROCYCLIQUES À ACTIVITÉ FONGICIDE | [2016/32] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2016 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/32] | 16.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0105769 (DOW AGROSCIENCES LLC [US]) [Y] 1,9-15 * compounds 381-403 * * claim 26 *; | [Y]WO0114339 (DOW AGROSCIENCES LLC [US]) [Y] 1,9-15 * compounds 381-403, 596-705 * * claim 26 *; | [Y]WO03035617 (DOW AGROSCIENCES LLC [US], et al) [Y] 1,9-15 * compounds 1, 2, 4-75 * * table 2 *; | [Y]WO2012070015 (STEMERGIE BIOTECHNOLOGY SA [CH], et al) [Y] 1,9-15 * examples 1-53 * * page 54, line 25 - page 55, line 3 *; | [E]WO2016007525 (DOW AGROSCIENCES LLC [US]) [E] 1-15 * tables 1, 3 * * compounds 2, 4 * | [Y] - Kazunori Tani ET AL, "VII. Membrane Injury Induced by C9-UK-2A, a Derivative of UK-2A, in Rhodotorula mucilaginosa IFO 0001 Material and Methods", THE JOURNAL OF ANTIBIOTICS, (20020101), pages 315 - 321, URL: https://www.jstage.jst.go.jp/article/antibiotics1968/55/3/55_3_315/_pdf, XP055360406 [Y] 1,9-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2004048864 (RICKS, MJ ET AL.); | [Y]WO2012070015 (CLEMENT-SCHATLO, V ET AL.); | [Y]US7250389 (SAKANAKA, O ET AL.); | [Y]US7183278 (IMAMURA, K ET AL.); | [A]US2005239873 (HOCKENBERY, DM ET AL.); | [A]US2004186296 (NIYAZ, NM ET AL.); | [A]US2004192924 (MEYER, KG ET AL.); | [A]WO0114339 (RICKS, MJ ET AL.); | [A]US2004171838 (MEYER, KG ET AL.) |