EP3052908 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MEASURING PARAMETERS OF OPTICAL ANISOTROPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.2017 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axometrics, Inc. 103 Quality Circle Suite 215 Huntsville, AL 35806 / US | [2016/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Matthew, H. 121 Whitehall Madison, AL 35758 / US | 02 /
ZOU, Yang 101 Alderwood Drive Madison, AL 35758 / US | [2016/32] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2016/32] | Application number, filing date | 14850913.6 | 03.10.2014 | [2016/32] | WO2014US59177 | Priority number, date | US201361887163P | 04.10.2013 Original published format: US 201361887163 P | US201414504426 | 02.10.2014 Original published format: US201414504426 | [2016/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015051329 | Date: | 09.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3052908 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01J4/00 | [2016/32] | CPC: |
G01N21/21 (EP,US);
G01N21/19 (EP,US);
G01N21/23 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR PARAMETERMESSUNG VON OPTISCHER ANISOTROPIE | [2016/32] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MEASURING PARAMETERS OF OPTICAL ANISOTROPY | [2016/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE MESURER DES PARAMÈTRES D'ANISOTROPIE OPTIQUE | [2016/32] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2016 | Search fee paid | 11.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/32] | 11.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2009069054 (OTSUKA DENSHI CO LTD) [Y] 1,2,7,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0108] , [0111] , [0114] , [0131] , [0140] * * figures 10,11 *; | [Y]JP2012024142 (FUJIFILM CORP) [Y] 1,2,7,8 * paragraphs [0096] , [0099] , [0104] *; | [A]JP2006226995 (MORITEX CORP) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0024] , [0025] , [0027] * | International search | [X]US6801312 (TIWALD); | [Y]US2009296089 (SMITH); | [A]US2003058442 (GARAB ET AL); | [A]US2007146632 (CHIPMAN) |