EP3052712 - CEMENTITIOUS PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Forticrete Limited 3 Boss Avenue Off Grovebury Road Leighton Buzzard, Bedfordshire LU7 4SD / GB | [2016/43] |
Former [2016/32] | For all designated states Oldcastle Architectural, Inc. 900 Ashwood Parkway Suite 600 Atlanta, Georgia 30338 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FIFIELD, John, Alfred 25 Allonby Way Aylesbury Buckinghamshire HP21 7JA / GB | 02 /
BROWNING, Leonard 654 Friar Drive Aurora, IL 60505 / US | [2016/32] | Representative(s) | Kent, Peter Joseph, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2016/32] | Application number, filing date | 14850962.3 | 03.10.2014 | [2016/32] | WO2014US58960 | Priority number, date | US201361886323P | 03.10.2013 Original published format: US 201361886323 P | [2016/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015051210 | Date: | 09.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3052712 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C04B41/00, C04B41/45, C04B41/61, C04B28/02, B28B13/02, // C04B111/00 | [2017/23] | CPC: |
B28B13/022 (EP);
B28B13/023 (EP);
C04B28/02 (EP);
C04B41/009 (EP);
C04B41/4578 (EP);
C04B41/61 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C04B28/02, C04B14/305, C04B40/0067, C04B40/0071 (EP);
C04B28/02, C04B40/0067, C04B40/0071, C04B2103/54 (EP);
C04B41/009, C04B28/02 (EP);
C04B41/4578, C04B41/4521, C04B41/4539, C04B2103/54 (EP); |
Former IPC [2016/32] | E04C1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/32] | Title | German: | ZEMENTARTIGES PRODUKT | [2016/32] | English: | CEMENTITIOUS PRODUCT | [2016/32] | French: | PRODUIT EN CIMENT | [2016/32] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 11.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/32] | 29.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP2984059 (VÄLINGE PHOTOCATALYTIC AB [SE]) [E] 1-10 * page 10, line 21 - line 27; figure 2; example 5; claims 1,5,14,19,21,23; table 5 *; | [X]GB2332170 (ENTWICKLUNGSGESELLSCHAFT WOLFG [DE]) [X] 15 * page 8, line 27 - page 10, line 16; figure 3 *; | [X]WO2013138298 (INTECRETE LLC [US]) [X] 1-14 * page 15, line 23 - page 17, line 22; figure 6; claims 14-18 *; | [X]US8377278 (CARDENAS HENRY E [US]) [X] 1-11 * column 5, line 26 - column 6, line 23; figure 3; example 2; claims 1,11 *; | [X]US3621086 (GULDE CHARLES JAMES) [X] 1-10,15 * column 3, line 13 - line 15; claim 1 * * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 29; figure 15; tables II,III * | International search | [X]EP2006259 (OLSON ET AL.); | [X]US5637236 (LOWE); | [Y]US8007584 (GARUTI JR. ET AL.); | [Y]US3621086 (GULDE); | [Y]US7435369 (HENNIS ET AL.); | [Y]US8142859 (DOMEY ET AL.) |