EP3055409 - METABOLICALLY OPTIMIZED CELL CULTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.12.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | [2016/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAWRENCE, Shawn 371 Kings Highway Valley Cottage New York 10989 / US | 02 /
KIM, Ann 300 Mamaroneck Ave, No. 434 White Plains, NY 10605 / US | 03 /
JOHNSON, Amy 953 Long Hill Road W Briarcliff Manor New York 10510 / US | [2016/36] |
Former [2016/33] | 01 /
LAWRENCE, Shawn 371 Kings Highway Valley Cottage New York 10989 / US | ||
02 /
KIM, Ann 181 Chatterton Parkway White Plains New York 10606 / US | |||
03 /
JOHNSON, Amy 953 Long Hill Road W Briarcliff Manor New York 10510 / US | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/17] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2016/33] | Nicholls, James Ronald J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14851841.8 | 10.10.2014 | [2016/33] | WO2014US59993 | Priority number, date | US201361889815P | 11.10.2013 Original published format: US 201361889815 P | [2016/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015054554 | Date: | 16.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3055409 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3055409 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 16.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/02, C12N5/16 | [2016/33] | CPC: |
C07K16/00 (EP,EA,KR,MX,US);
C12N5/06 (EA,KR);
C12N5/0682 (EA,US);
C12N5/00 (EP,EA,MX,US);
C12P21/02 (EP,EA,KR,MX,US);
C07K2317/14 (EP,EA,KR,MX,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METABOLISCH OPTIMIERTE ZELLKULTUR | [2016/33] | English: | METABOLICALLY OPTIMIZED CELL CULTURE | [2016/33] | French: | CULTURE CELLULAIRE À MÉTABOLISME OPTIMISÉ | [2016/33] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 22.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/33] | 01.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.03.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 19.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18161278.9 / EP3351620 | EP20193898.2 / EP3812453 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.01.2019
31.01.2019
ADMISSIBLE Neuefeind, Regina Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE Opponent's representative Maiwald GmbH, et al, et al Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.01.2019
31.01.2019
ADMISSIBLE Neuefeind, Regina Maiwald Patentanwalts - und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE Opponent's representative Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH, et al, et al Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | 08.02.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.06.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.09.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.10.2020 | 01.10.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.03.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.06.2021 | 10.06.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.07.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.10.2021 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 04.10.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 13.12.2021 | Appeal received No. T2226/21 | 13.12.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 14.02.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 17.09.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 25.04.2018 | AT | 25.04.2018 | CY | 25.04.2018 | CZ | 25.04.2018 | EE | 25.04.2018 | HR | 25.04.2018 | LT | 25.04.2018 | LV | 25.04.2018 | MC | 25.04.2018 | MK | 25.04.2018 | RO | 25.04.2018 | RS | 25.04.2018 | SI | 25.04.2018 | SK | 25.04.2018 | SM | 25.04.2018 | TR | 25.04.2018 | BG | 25.07.2018 | GR | 26.07.2018 | IS | 25.08.2018 | PT | 27.08.2018 | LU | 10.10.2018 | MT | 10.10.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CY | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
MK | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
LU | 10.10.2018 | ||
MT | 10.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
LU | 10.10.2018 | ||
MT | 10.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
LU | 10.10.2018 | ||
MT | 10.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
LU | 10.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
LU | 10.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | EE | 25.04.2018 | |
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | HR | 25.04.2018 | |
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | HR | 25.04.2018 | |
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | HR | 25.04.2018 | |
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | HR | 25.04.2018 | |
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | LT | 25.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - BHANU CHANDRA MULUKUTLA ET AL, "On metabolic shift to lactate consumption in fed-batch culture of mammalian cells", METABOLIC ENGINEERING, ACADEMIC PRESS, US, vol. 14, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.YMBEN.2011.12.006, ISSN 1096-7176, (20111216), pages 138 - 149, (20120108), XP028466094 [A] 1-18 * page 139, column l, lines 2-10 * * page 147, column r, lines 5-8 * * page 148, column l, paragraph last - column r, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymben.2011.12.006 | [A] - FRANCESCA ZAGARI ET AL, "Lactate metabolism shift in CHO cell culture: the role of mitochondrial oxidative activity", NEW BIOTECHNOLOGY, NL, (20130101), vol. 30, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.nbt.2012.05.021, ISSN 1871-6784, pages 238 - 245, XP055295213 [A] 1-18 * page 239, column l, paragraph 2 - column r, paragraph last * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nbt.2012.05.021 | [A] - JAMEY D YOUNG, "Metabolic flux rewiring in mammalian cell cultures", CURRENT OPINION IN BIOTECHNOLOGY., GB, (20130528), vol. 24, no. 6, doi:10.1016/j.copbio.2013.04.016, ISSN 0958-1669, pages 1108 - 1115, XP055295214 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.copbio.2013.04.016 | [A] - ZHOU W ET AL, "Fed-batch culture of recombinant NS0 myeloma cells with high monoclonal antibody production", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, WILEY & SONS, HOBOKEN, NJ, US, (19970101), vol. 55, doi:10.1002/(SICI)1097-0290(19970905)55:5<783::AID-BIT8>3.0.CO;2-7, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 783 - 792, XP002170348 [A] 1-18 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0290(19970905)55:5<783::AID-BIT8>3.0.CO;2-7 | [A] - FENG LI ET AL, "Cell culture processes for monoclonal antibody production", MABS, (20100901), vol. 2, no. 5, doi:10.4161/mabs.2.5.12720, ISSN 1942-0862, pages 466 - 479, XP055166177 [A] 1-18 * figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/mabs.2.5.12720 | International search | [X]US8470552 (CROUGHAN MATTHEW S [US], et al); | [X] - LE, H. ET AL., "Multivariate analysis of cell culture bioprocess data - lactate consumption as process indicator", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2012), vol. 162, no. 2-3, pages 210 - 223, XP055287323 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jbiotec.2012.08.021 | [X] - SHEIKHOLESLAMI, Z. ET AL., "The impact of the timing of induction on the metabolism and productivity of CHO cells in culture", BIOCHEMICAL ENGINEERING JOURNAL, (2013), vol. 79, pages 162 - 171, XP028733030 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bej.2013.07.015 | [X] - MA, N. ET AL., "A single nutrient feed supports both chemically defined NSO and CHO fed-batch processes: improved productivity and lactate metabolism", BIOTECHNOLOGY PROGRESS, (2009), vol. 25, no. 5, pages 1353 - 1363, XP055287324 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/btpr.238 | by applicant | US5589466 | US5973972 | US5972650 | US6165741 | WO2004104186 | WO2007059782 | US7390660 | US7435553 | US2009162901 | US7575890 | US2010291626 | US8192951 | US8470552 | - GAMBHIR, A. et al., J Bioscience Bioeng, (20030000), vol. 95, no. 4, pages 317 - 327 | - OZTURK, S.S.; RILEY, M.R.; PALSSON, B.O., Biotechnol. and Bioeng., (19920000), vol. 39, pages 418 - 431 | - ZAGARI et al., New Biotechnol., (20130000), vol. 30, no. 2, pages 238 - 45 | - KIM, S.H.; LEE, G.M., Appl. Microbiol. Biotechnol., (20070000), vol. 74, pages 152 - 159 | - KIM, S.H.; LEE, G.M., Appl. Microbiol. Biotechnol., (20070000), vol. 76, pages 659 - 665 | - WLASCHIN, K.F; HU, W-S., J. Biotechnol., (20070000), vol. 131, pages 168 - 176 | - A. F. et al., Biotechnol. Bioeng., (20000000), vol. 67, pages 25 - 34 | - CRUZ et al., Biotechnol Bioeng, (19990000), vol. 66, no. 2, pages 104 - 113 | - ZHOU et al., Cytotechnology, (19970000), vol. 24, pages 99 - 108 | - XIE; WANG, Biotechnol Bioeng, (19940000), vol. 43, pages 1174 - 89 | - NEWLAND et al., Biotechnol. Bioeng., (19940000), vol. 43, no. 5, pages 434 - 8 | - QUEK et al., Metab Eng, (20100000), vol. 12, no. 2, pages 161 - 71 | - MULUKUTLA B.C. et al., "discloses on metabolic shift to lactate consumption in fed-batch culture", Metab Eng., (20110000), vol. 14, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ymben.2011.12.006, pages 138 - 49, XP028466094 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymben.2011.12.006 | - ZAGARI F. et al., "discloses lactate metabolism shift in CHO cell culture and the role of mitochondrial oxidative activity", N Biotechnol., (20130000), vol. 30, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/j.nbt.2012.05.021, pages 238 - 45, XP055295213 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nbt.2012.05.021 | - YOUNG D.J., "discloses metabolic flux rewiring in mammalian cell cultures", Curr Opin Biotechnol., (20130000), vol. 24, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1016/j.copbio.2013.04.016, pages 1108 - 1115, XP055295214 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.copbio.2013.04.016 | - ZHOU W. et al., "discloses fed-batch culture of recombinant NSO myeloma cells with high monoclonal antibody production", Biotechnol Bioeng., (19970000), vol. 55, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1002/(SICI)1097-0290(19970905)55:5<783::AID-BIT8>3.0.CO;2-7, pages 783 - 92, XP002298389 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0290(19970905)55:5<783::AID-BIT8>3.0.CO;2-7 | - LI F. et al., "discloses cell culture processes for monoclonal antibody production", MAbs., (20100000), vol. 2, no. 5, doi:doi:10.4161/mabs.2.5.12720, pages 466 - 79, XP055166177 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/mabs.2.5.12720 | - LE H. et al., "discloses multivariate analysis of cell culture bioprocess data and lactate consumption as process indicator", J Biotechnol., (20120000), vol. 162, no. 2-3, pages 210 - 23 | - SHEIKHOLESLAMI Z. et al., "discloses the impact of the timing of induction on the metabolism and productivity of CHO cells in culture", Biochem Eng J., (20130000), vol. 79, doi:doi:10.1016/j.bej.2013.07.015, pages 162 - 171, XP028733030 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bej.2013.07.015 | - MA N. et al., "discloses a single nutrient feed supports both chemically defined NSO and CHO fed-batch processes: Improved productivity and lactate metabolism", Biotechnol Prog., (20090000), vol. 25, no. 5, pages 1353 - 63 | - KIM; BJ et al., Biotechnol Bioeng., (20120100), vol. 109, no. 1, pages 137 - 45 | - OMASA et al., Current Pharmaceutical Biotechnology, (20100000), vol. 11, pages 233 - 240 | - BLECKWENN, NA; SHILOACH, J., "Large-scale cell culture", Curr Protoc Immunol., (20040000), vol. 59 | - XIE; WANG, Biotechnol. Bioeng., (19940000), vol. 43, no. 11, pages 1175 - 1189 | - ZAGARI et al., New Biotechnol., (20130000), vol. 30, no. 2, pages 238 - 245 | - LI, F. et al., mAbs, (20100000), vol. 2, no. 5, pages 466 - 479 | - JAIN, M. et al., Science, (20120525), vol. 336, no. 6084, pages 1040 - 1044 | - DE LA LUZ-HDEZ, K., "Metabolomics and Mammalian Cell Culture", Metabolomics, (20120000), ISBN 978-953-51-0046-1 | - CHOTHIA; LESK, J. Mol. Biol., (19870000), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917 | - HOLLIGER et al., PNAS USA, (19930000), vol. 90, no. 14, pages 6444 - 8 | - WARD et al., Nature, (19890000), vol. 341, pages 544 - 546 | - HOLT et al., Trends Biotechnol., (20030000), vol. 21, no. 11, pages 484 - 90 | - REVETS et al., Expert Opin Biol Ther, (20050000), vol. 5, no. 1, pages 111 - 24 | - "Escherichia coli and Salmonella", Cellular and Molecular Biology, ASM Press, (19960000), vol. 2 | - FEIL et al., Biochem. Biophys. Res. Commun., (19970000), vol. 237, pages 752 - 757 | - ARAKI et al., PNAS, (19950000), vol. 92, pages 160 - 4 | - NAGY, A et al., Genesis, (20000000), vol. 26, pages 99 - 109 | - ARAKI et al., Nuc Acids Res, (20020000), vol. 30, no. 19, page e103 | - DYMECKI, S., PNAS, (19960000), vol. 93, no. 12, pages 6191 - 6196 | - RON D; WALTER P., Nat Rev Mol Cell Biol., (20070000), vol. 8, pages 519 - 529 | - OLIVARI et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20050000), vol. 280, no. 4, pages 2424 - 2428 | - VEMBAR; BRODSKY, Nat. Rev. Mol. Cell. Biol., (20080000), vol. 9, no. 12, pages 944 - 957 | Opposition | US2006160180 | US2011104734 | - LUO et al., "Comparative metabolite analysis to understand lactate metabolism shift in Chinese hamster ovary cell culture process", Biotechnology and Bioengineering, (20120100), vol. 109, no. 1, pages 146 - 156, XP055135701 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.23291 | - LI et al., "Feeding lactate for CHO cell culture processes: Impact on culture metabolism and performance", Biotechnology and Bioengineering, (20120000), vol. 109, pages 1173 - 1186, XP055557032 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.24389 | - LI et al., "Cell culture processes for monoclonal antibody production", mAbs, (20100000), vol. 2, no. 5, pages 466 - 477, XP055166177 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/mabs.2.5.12720 | - ZAGARI et al., "Lactate metabolism shift in CHO cell culture: the role of mitochondrial oxidative activity", New Biotechnology, (20130100), vol. 30, no. 2, pages 238 - 245, XP055295213 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nbt.2012.05.021 |