EP3055086 - PROCESS FOR UPSET FORGING OF DRILL PIPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.05.2019 [2019/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hunting Energy Services Inc. 2 Northpoint Drive, Suite 400 Houston, TX 77060-3236 / US | [2016/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIRBY, Klane Edward 1304 NW 15th Street Moore, OK 73170 / US | 02 /
ADKINS, Gregory Lynn 115 Warmstone Bridge Drive Lafayette, LA 70508 / US | [2016/33] | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Postfach 70 04 25 81304 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/33] | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Poccistrasse 11 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14851894.7 | 30.09.2014 | [2016/33] | WO2014US58267 | Priority number, date | US201361888631P | 09.10.2013 Original published format: US 201361888631 P | [2016/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015053984 | Date: | 16.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3055086 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B21D41/00, B21J5/08, B21J9/12, B21K21/12 | [2017/25] | CPC: |
B21J5/08 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B21D41/00 (MX,RU,US);
B21J9/06 (KR);
B21J9/08 (EP,KR,US);
B21K21/12 (EP,KR,US);
E21B7/046 (US);
E21B17/042 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/33] | B21D41/00, B21J5/08, B21J9/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ANSTAUCHEN EINES BOHRGESTÄNGES IM GESENK | [2016/33] | English: | PROCESS FOR UPSET FORGING OF DRILL PIPE | [2016/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE REFOULAGE DE TUBE DE FORAGE | [2016/33] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2016 | Search fee paid | 29.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/33] | 21.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/18] | Divisional application(s) | EP19163884.0 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN101096044 (BAOSHAN IRON & STEEL [CN]) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0009] , [0011] , [0014] , [0015] , [0024] , [0033]; figure - *; | [I]CN1887473 (BAOSHAN IRON & STEEL [CN]) [I] 1-4 * paragraphs [0001] , [0011] - [0016]; figure - *; | [I]US5517843 (WINSHIP THOMAS E [US]) [I] 1-4 * column 5, line 21 - column 7, line 20; figure - *; | [I]US4845972 (TAKEUCHI EIZO [JP], et al) [I] 1-4 * column 5, line 30 - column 7, line 7; figure - *; | [I]US4213322 (BARNES FLOYD A JR [US]) [I] 1-4 * column 4, line 35 - column 5, line 18; figure - *; | [A]WO2013053449 (VAM DRILLING FRANCE [FR], et al) [A] 1-4 * figures 1,2 * | International search | [X]US4192167 (HUEBNER BERNHARD [DE], et al); | [Y]US5826921 (WOOLLEY BROWN J [US]); | [A]US4487357 (SIMON JOSEPH A [US]); | [A]US4845972 (TAKEUCHI EIZO [JP], et al); | [A]US5184495 (CHUNN WILLIAM G [US], et al); | [A]US5361846 (CARLIN FRANK J [US], et al); | [A]US5517843 (WINSHIP THOMAS E [US]); | [A]US6808210 (HARRISON GREGORY T [US], et al); | [A]US7610667 (HASHEM GHAZI J [US]) |