EP3054805 - SHOE HAVING MULTIPLE SOLE MEMBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cole Haan LLC 45 West 18th Street Third Floor New York, New York 10011 / US | [2016/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENDERSON, Jeff 315 E. 86th Street, 7PE New York, New York 10028 / US | 02 /
CHIOU, George c/o Cole Haan LLC 45 West 18th Street, Third Floor New York, New York 10011 / US | [2021/20] |
Former [2016/37] | 01 /
HENDERSON, Jeff 315 E. 86th Street 7PE New York, New York 10028 / US | ||
02 /
CHIOU, George c/o Cole Haan LLC 45 West 18th Street, Third Floor New York, NY 10011 / US | |||
Former [2016/33] | 01 /
HENDERSON, Jeff 315 E. 86th Street 7PE New York, New York 10028 / US | ||
02 /
CHIOU, George 20610 NW Sedona Lane Beaverton, Oregon 97006 / US | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [2021/20] |
Former [2016/33] | Lavoix Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14852698.1 | 09.10.2014 | [2016/33] | WO2014US59928 | Priority number, date | US201314051092 | 10.10.2013 Original published format: US201314051092 | [2016/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015054510 | Date: | 16.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3054805 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3054805 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A43B13/00 | [2016/33] | CPC: |
A43B13/125 (EP,KR,US);
A43B13/141 (EP,KR,US);
A43B13/187 (EP,KR,US);
A43B13/20 (KR);
A43B3/0057 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUH MIT MEHREREN SOHLENELEMENTEN | [2016/33] | English: | SHOE HAVING MULTIPLE SOLE MEMBERS | [2016/33] | French: | CHAUSSURE AYANT DE MULTIPLES ÉLÉMENTS DE SEMELLE | [2016/33] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2016 | Search fee paid | 03.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/33] | 19.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.10.2014 | AL | 19.05.2021 | AT | 19.05.2021 | CY | 19.05.2021 | CZ | 19.05.2021 | DK | 19.05.2021 | EE | 19.05.2021 | FI | 19.05.2021 | HR | 19.05.2021 | IT | 19.05.2021 | LT | 19.05.2021 | LV | 19.05.2021 | MC | 19.05.2021 | MK | 19.05.2021 | PL | 19.05.2021 | RO | 19.05.2021 | RS | 19.05.2021 | SE | 19.05.2021 | SI | 19.05.2021 | SK | 19.05.2021 | SM | 19.05.2021 | TR | 19.05.2021 | BG | 19.08.2021 | NO | 19.08.2021 | GR | 20.08.2021 | IS | 19.09.2021 | PT | 20.09.2021 | IE | 09.10.2021 | CH | 31.10.2021 | LI | 31.10.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 09.10.2014 | |
AL | 19.05.2021 | ||
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CY | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
IT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
MK | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
IE | 09.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 09.10.2014 | |
AL | 19.05.2021 | ||
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CY | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
IT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
IE | 09.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 09.10.2014 | |
AL | 19.05.2021 | ||
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
IT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
IE | 09.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
IT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
IE | 09.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
IT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
IT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4438573 (MCBARRON GEORGE P [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2007169376 (HATFIELD TOBIE D [US], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [XAI]WO2010099710 (LIN YONGJIAN [CN]) [X] 1-5,8,12,13 * abstract * * figures 4-7 * [A] 6,7,14 [I] 9-11,15; | [XAI]EP2548465 (SALOMON SAS [FR]) [X] 1-5,8,12,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0027] - [0054] * * figures 1-5 * [A] 6,7,14 [I] 9-11,15 | International search | [A]US2201300 (PRUE WALTER W); | [Y]US3061950 (BETH LEVINE); | [A]US6023859 (BURKE ROBERT [CA], et al); | [Y]US7752772 (HATFIELD TOBIE D [US], et al) | Examination | US2010313447 | by applicant | WO2010099710 | US2010313447 | EP2548465 |