EP3060123 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR OPTIMIZING THE DETECTION OF FLUORESCENT SIGNALS FROM BIOMARKERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.02.2022 [2022/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharmacophotonics, Inc. D/B/A Fast Biomedical 9650 Commerce Drive Suite 521 Carmel IN 46032 / US | [2016/47] |
Former [2016/35] | For all designated states Pharmacophotonics, Inc. D/B/A Fast Biomedical 351 West Tenth Street Suite 358 Indianapolis, Indiana 46202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANDOVAL, JR., Ruben c/o PharmacoPhotonics, Inc. d/b/a FAST BioMedical 9650 Commerce Drive Suite 521 Carmel, Indiana 46032 / US | 02 /
SHERIDAN, Erinn c/o PharmacoPhotonics, Inc. d/b/a FAST BioMedical 9650 Commerce Drive Suite 521 Carmel, Indiana 46032 / US | 03 /
MEIER, Daniel c/o PharmacoPhotonics, Inc. d/b/a FAST BioMedical 351 West Tenth Street Suite 358 Indianapolis, Indiana 46202 / US | [2016/41] |
Former [2016/35] | 01 /
SANDOVAL, JR., Ruben c/o PharmacoPhotonics, Inc. d/b/a FAST BioMedical 351 West Tenth Street Suite 358 Indianapolis, Indiana 46202 / US | ||
02 /
SHERIDAN, Erinn c/o PharmacoPhotonics, Inc. d/b/a FAST BioMedical 351 West Tenth Street Suite 358 Indianapolis, Indiana 46202 / US | |||
03 /
MEIER, Daniel c/o PharmacoPhotonics, Inc. d/b/a FAST BioMedical 351 West Tenth Street Suite 358 Indianapolis, Indiana 46202 / US | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/35] | Armstrong, Iain Cheshire HGF Limited 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | Application number, filing date | 14855160.9 | 24.10.2014 | [2016/35] | WO2014US62170 | Priority number, date | US201361894963P | 24.10.2013 Original published format: US 201361894963 P | [2016/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015061680 | Date: | 30.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3060123 | Date: | 31.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K49/00, A61M5/00 | [2017/26] | CPC: |
G01N21/6428 (EP,US);
A61K49/0041 (EP,US);
A61K49/0054 (EP,US);
A61M5/007 (US);
G01N2021/6417 (US);
G01N2021/6439 (US);
G01N2201/13 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/35] | A61B5/145, A61K49/00, A61B5/20, G01N21/64 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/35] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR OPTIMIERUNG DER ERKENNUNG VON FLUORESZENZSIGNALEN IN BIOMARKERN | [2016/35] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR OPTIMIZING THE DETECTION OF FLUORESCENT SIGNALS FROM BIOMARKERS | [2016/35] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS D'OPTIMISATION DE LA DÉTECTION DE SIGNAUX FLUORESCENTS ÉMIS PAR DES BIOMARQUEURS | [2016/35] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2016 | Search fee paid | 24.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/35] | 22.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/06] | 07.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2021 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4640898 (HALFMAN CLARKE J [US]) [X] 1,6,12,13,15 * column 4, line 55 - line 64; figures 1,2 * [Y] 2-5,7-11,14; | [XY]US4816419 (HALFMAN CLARKE J [US]) [X] 1,6,12,13,15 * column 3, line 30 - line 39; figures 3,4 * [Y] 2-5,7-11,14; | [Y]US2011201940 (WANG EXING [US], et al) [Y] 2-5,7-11,14 * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0096] * * paragraph [0129] * * paragraph [0145] - paragraph [0146] *; | [Y]US2013096309 (BREMBERG ULF [SE], et al) [Y] 11 * figure 5 * | [X] - MATHUR N ET AL, "Detection of DNA Sequence with Enhanced Sensitivity and Higher FRET Efficiency Using a Light-Emitting Polymer, Peptide Nucleic Acid Probe and Anionic Surfactant System", JOURNAL OF BIOMATERIALS SCIENCE. POLYMER EDITION, VSP, UTRECHT, NL, (20110101), vol. 22, no. 1-3, doi:10.1163/092050610X486973, ISSN 0920-5063, pages 379 - 387, XP008184351 [X] 1,12 * abstract * * page 381, paragraph last - page 382, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1163/092050610X486973 | [A] - HAI YAN DU ET AL, "Effect of Anionic Surfactants with Different Structure on the Fluorescent Properties of the CPPO-H2O2-Rhodamine B System", MATERIALS SCIENCE FORUM, (20101101), vol. 663-665, doi:10.4028/www.scientific.net/MSF.663-665.207, pages 207 - 210, XP055368605 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4028/www.scientific.net/MSF.663-665.207 | International search | [Y]US2011201940 (WANG EXING [US], et al); | [Y]US2013230876 (ROSCOE STEPHEN B [US], et al); | [Y]US4816419 (HALFMAN CLARKE J [US]); | [Y]US2013096309 (BREMBERG ULF [SE], et al) | by applicant | US20090425827 | US20100946471 | WO2009US40994 | WO2010US32997 |