EP3061361 - SHOE WITH A SUSPENDED HEEL AND METHOD FOR FACILITATING ADAPTATION TO THE NATURAL SUSPENDED HEEL RUNNING TECHNIQUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2018 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beneyto Abad, Francisco Jose C/ Lepanto 1 Puerta 2 Denia 03700 Alicante / ES | [2016/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2016/35] | Representative(s) | Sempere Massa, Iván Luis C/Gerona, 15-17, 1º 03001 Alicante / ES | [2016/35] | Application number, filing date | 14855349.8 | 21.10.2014 | [2016/35] | WO2014ES70792 | Priority number, date | ES20130000903U | 22.10.2013 Original published format: ES 201300903 U | ES20130000979U | 07.11.2013 Original published format: ES 201300979 U | [2016/35] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015059332 | Date: | 30.04.2015 | Language: | ES | [2015/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3061361 | Date: | 31.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 30.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A43B13/14, A43B13/16, A43B13/18 | [2017/43] | CPC: |
A43B13/16 (EP);
A43B13/145 (EP);
A43B13/184 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2016/35] | A43B13/14, A43B13/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/35] | Title | German: | SCHUH MIT GEFEDERTEM ABSATZ UND VERFAHREN ZUM ERLEICHTERN DER ANPASSUNG AN EINE NATÜRLICHE LAUFTECHNIK MIT DEM GEFEDERTEN ABSATZ | [2016/35] | English: | SHOE WITH A SUSPENDED HEEL AND METHOD FOR FACILITATING ADAPTATION TO THE NATURAL SUSPENDED HEEL RUNNING TECHNIQUE | [2016/35] | French: | CHAUSSURE DE SPORT À TALON SUSPENDU ET PROCÉDÉ FACILITANT L'ADAPTATION À LA TECHNIQUE DE COURSE NATURELLE À TALON SUSPENDU | [2016/35] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2016 | Translation filed | 23.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2016 | Search fee paid | 23.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/35] | 27.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/42] | 06.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2428366 (GRAVES GARVIN HAMPTON [GB]) [X] 1,2 * 3rd paragraph; page 6; figure 1 * [Y] 9; | [XY]US2005160625 (WHATLEY IAN H [US]) [X] 1,2 * figure 16 * [Y] 9; | [XY]US2009119951 (HARTVELD ADRI [GB]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0028]; figure 1 * [Y] 9; | [XY]US8356426 (DANIEL ISAAC SAYO [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * column 3, lines 58-63; figures 3A,4,6 * [Y] 9; | [Y]DE4418475 (T & T MEDILOGIC MEDIZINTECHNIK [DE]) [Y] 9 * col1, l.58-68; col.3, l.21-34;; figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]EP2019602 (NIKE INTERNATIONAL LTD [US]) [A] 9 * figure 4 *; | [A] - Howcast, "Proper Lower Body Running Posture | Sprinting", (20130809), YouTube, URL: https://youtu.be/3X82dc5gOgA, (20170914), XP002773787 [A] 9 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US4949476 (ANDERIE WOLF [DE]); | [X]US5694706 (PENKA ETIENNE [US]); | [X]US5829172 (KANEKO YASUNORI [JP]); | [X]WO02060291 (SYDNEY DESIGN TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al); | [Y]WO03103430 (GLIDE N LOCK GMBH [CH], et al); | [A]WO2012112930 (NIKE INTERNATIONAL LTD [US], et al); | [X]KR20120095164 (PARK YOUNG SOUL [KR]) |