EP3198869 - INTRA-PREDICTION COMPLEXITY REDUCTION USING A REDUCED NUMBER OF ANGULAR MODES AND SUBSEQUENT REFINEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2017/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOVAL, Pavel Sergeyevich Domodedovskaya 1/3-54 Moscow 115551 / RU | 02 /
SHOSTAK, Nikolai Petrovich Ignata Titova 3-124 Krasnogorsk 143405 / RU | 03 /
KULAKOV, Leonid Alexeyevich Reutovskaya Str. 8-3-132 Moscow 111539 / RU | 04 /
FADEEV, Alexey Veniaminovich Turgeneva 30 Nizhny Novgorod 603163 / RU | [2017/31] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2017/31] | Application number, filing date | 14856787.8 | 23.09.2014 | [2017/31] | WO2014RU00704 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016048183 | Date: | 31.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3198869 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/176, H04N19/11, H04N19/146 | [2017/31] | CPC: |
H04N19/176 (EP,CN,US);
H04N19/159 (US);
H04N19/11 (EP,CN,US);
H04N19/146 (EP,CN,US);
H04N19/182 (US);
H04N19/50 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/31] | Title | German: | INTRAPRÄDIKATIONSKOMPLEXITÄTSVERRINGERUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER VERRINGERTEN ANZAHL VON WINKELMODEN UND NACHFOLGENDER VERFEINERUNG | [2017/31] | English: | INTRA-PREDICTION COMPLEXITY REDUCTION USING A REDUCED NUMBER OF ANGULAR MODES AND SUBSEQUENT REFINEMENT | [2017/31] | French: | RÉDUCTION DE COMPLEXITÉ D'INTRAPRÉDICTION AU MOYEN D'UN NOMBRE RÉDUIT DE MODES ANGULAIRES ET AMÉLIORATION CONSÉCUTIVE | [2017/31] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/31] | 20.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 01.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2014120389 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [I] 1-24 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0028] *; | [XI] - HAO ZHANG ET AL, Fast Intra Prediction for High Efficiency Video Coding, ADVANCES IN MULTIMEDIA INFORMATION PROCESSING PCM 2012, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 568 - 577, (20121204), ISBN 978-3-642-34777-1, XP047014245 [X] 1,2,4-7,9-12,14-16,18-22,24 * page 573 - page 574 * [I] 3,8,13,17,23 | [I] - SHARABAYKO MAXIM P ET AL, "Iterative intra prediction search for H.265/HEVC", 2013 INTERNATIONAL SIBERIAN CONFERENCE ON CONTROL AND COMMUNICATIONS (SIBCON), IEEE, (20130912), doi:10.1109/SIBCON.2013.6693615, pages 1 - 4, XP032546362 [I] 1-24 * III. Iterative intra prediction search; page 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SIBCON.2013.6693615 | [A] - MCCANN K ET AL, "High Efficiency Video Coding (HEVC) Test Model 13 (HM 13) Encoder Description", 15. JCT-VC MEETING; 23-10-2013 - 1-11-2013; GENEVA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20140107), no. JCTVC-O1002, XP030115456 [A] 1-24 * Section 4.6.1 intra prediction mode and parameters * |