EP3066011 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DEEP-DRAWING A TRAY FROM SHEET MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stora Enso Oyj P.O. Box 309 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2019/32] |
Former [2016/37] | For all designated states Stora Enso Oyj P. O. Box 309 00101 Helsinki / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RÄSÄNEN, Jari Jari Räsänen Västäräkinkuja 15 FI-55420 Imatra / FI | 02 /
LINDELL, Henry Henry Lindell Leppärinne 5C29 FI-55800 Imatra / FI | 03 /
NEVALAINEN, Kimmo Kimmo Nevalainen Raamikatu 13 FI-48910 Kotka / FI | 04 /
TANNINEN, Panu Panu Tanninen Niementie 8 as 5 FI-55320 Rauha / FI | 05 /
MATTHEWS, Sami Sami Matthews Kierniemenraitti 4A 16 FI-53850 Lappeenranta / FI | 06 /
HILTUNEN, Mari Mari Hiltunen Pihlajarinne 1C FI-55800 Imatra / FI | 07 /
KYLLIANEN, Outi Joukahaisenkuja, 6 55100 Imatra / FI | [2016/37] | Representative(s) | Steinrud, Henrik, et al Stora Enso AB Group Intellectual Property Box 9090 65009 Karlstad / SE | [2019/32] |
Former [2016/37] | Lindberg, Berndt Åke Stora Enso AB Group Intellectual Property Box 9090 650 09 Karlstad / SE | Application number, filing date | 14857322.3 | 17.10.2014 | [2016/37] | WO2014IB65410 | Priority number, date | SE20130051301 | 04.11.2013 Original published format: SE 1351301 | [2016/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015063643 | Date: | 07.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3066011 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3066011 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 07.05.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/26, B29C51/08, B31F1/00, B32B38/12 | [2016/37] | CPC: |
B29C51/082 (EP,US);
B65D1/26 (RU,SE);
B31F1/0077 (SE,US);
B29C51/08 (EP,SE,US);
B29C51/145 (EP,US);
B29C51/30 (US);
B29C51/306 (US);
B31B50/592 (EP,US);
B31F1/00 (EP,US);
B32B38/12 (SE);
B29K2105/256 (US);
B29K2995/0067 (US);
B29K2995/0069 (US);
B29L2009/005 (US);
B29L2031/712 (US);
B31B2110/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM TIEFZIEHEN EINER SCHALE AUS BLATTFÖRMIGEM MATERIAL | [2016/37] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DEEP-DRAWING A TRAY FROM SHEET MATERIAL | [2016/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'EMBOUTISSAGE PROFOND D'UN PLATEAU À PARTIR D'UNE MATIÈRE EN FEUILLE | [2016/37] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 06.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/37] | 03.03.2017 | Observations by third parties | 28.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19175406.8 / EP3566962 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.10.2014 | AL | 07.08.2019 | CY | 07.08.2019 | CZ | 07.08.2019 | EE | 07.08.2019 | HR | 07.08.2019 | LT | 07.08.2019 | LV | 07.08.2019 | MC | 07.08.2019 | MK | 07.08.2019 | MT | 07.08.2019 | NL | 07.08.2019 | RO | 07.08.2019 | RS | 07.08.2019 | SE | 07.08.2019 | SI | 07.08.2019 | SK | 07.08.2019 | SM | 07.08.2019 | TR | 07.08.2019 | IE | 17.10.2019 | BE | 31.10.2019 | BG | 07.11.2019 | NO | 07.11.2019 | GR | 08.11.2019 | IS | 07.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 17.10.2014 | |
AL | 07.08.2019 | ||
CY | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
MT | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IE | 17.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 17.10.2014 | |
AL | 07.08.2019 | ||
CY | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IE | 17.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
CY | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IE | 17.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IE | 17.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | HR | 07.08.2019 | |
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | HR | 07.08.2019 | |
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | LT | 07.08.2019 | |
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | LT | 07.08.2019 | |
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 07.08.2019 | |
NO | 07.11.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0082209 (CHAMPION INT CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,9-11,15 * page 3, lines 14-18 * * page 8, line 28 - page 9, line 24; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0433857 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1-15* figures 1-7 *; | [A]US2002086784 (DAI WEN-LONG [TW]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0025]; figures 1-11 *; | [A]EP1985437 (GRUPPO X DI X GRUPPO S R L [IT]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0044]; figures 1-19 * | International search | [A]GB1553975 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [A]JP2004154959 (TOKAN KOGYO CO LTD); | [A]WO2010018306 (STORA ENSO OYJ [FI], et al); | [X]WO2011098886 (SARONG SPA [IT], et al); | [A]WO2013140034 (STORA ENSO OYJ [FI]) | other | US3695084 | US4108941 | GB1553975 | US4246223 | JP2004154959 | US2005109653 | EP1985437 | WO2010018306 | WO2011098886 | WO2013140034 |