EP3065202 - ORGANIC/INORGANIC COMPOSITE POROUS MEMBRANE, AND SEPARATOR AND ELECTRODE STRUCTURE COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/36] | ORGANIC-INORGANIC COMPLEX POROUS MEMBRANE, SEPARATOR COMPRISING SAME, AND ELECTRODE STRUCTURE BODY | ||
[2019/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2019/51] |
Former [2016/36] | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIN, Sun-Mi LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-738 / KR | 02 /
YU, Hyung-Kyun LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-738 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Joo-Sung LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-738 / KR | [2016/36] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2020/03] |
Former [2016/36] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14859049.0 | 31.10.2014 | [2016/36] | WO2014KR10386 | Priority number, date | KR20130131527 | 31.10.2013 Original published format: KR 20130131527 | [2016/36] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015065116 | Date: | 07.05.2015 | Language: | KO | [2015/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3065202 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3065202 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.05.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/16, H01M2/14, // H01M10/052 | [2017/27] | CPC: |
H01M50/403 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/446 (EP,KR,US);
C08J5/2206 (KR,US);
H01M10/052 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/414 (KR);
H01M50/417 (EP,US);
H01M50/431 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/443 (KR);
H01M50/451 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/454 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/457 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/46 (KR);
H01M50/489 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/491 (EP,KR,US);
H01M2220/30 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/36] | H01M2/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PORÖSE MEMBRAN MIT EINEM ORGANISCH-ANORGANISCHEN KOMPOSIT, UND SEPARATOR UND ELEKTRODENSTRUKTURKÖRPER DAMIT | [2019/52] | English: | ORGANIC/INORGANIC COMPOSITE POROUS MEMBRANE, AND SEPARATOR AND ELECTRODE STRUCTURE COMPRISING THE SAME | [2019/52] | French: | MEMBRANE POREUSE COMPOSITE ORGANIQUE-INORGANIQUE, ET SÉPARATEUR ET CORPS STRUCTUREL D'ÉLECTRODE COMPRENANT CETTE MEMBRANE | [2019/52] |
Former [2016/36] | PORÖSE MEMBRAN MIT EINEM ORGANISCH-ANORGANISCHEN KOMPLEX, SEPARATOR DAMIT UND ELEKTRODENSTRUKTURKÖRPER | ||
Former [2016/36] | ORGANIC-INORGANIC COMPLEX POROUS MEMBRANE, SEPARATOR COMPRISING SAME, AND ELECTRODE STRUCTURE BODY | ||
Former [2016/36] | MEMBRANE POREUSE COMPLEXE ORGANIQUE-INORGANIQUE, SÉPARATEUR COMPRENANT CETTE MEMBRANE, ET CORPS STRUCTUREL D'ÉLECTRODE | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2015 | Translation filed | 26.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2015 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/36] | 01.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.10.2014 | AL | 15.01.2020 | AT | 15.01.2020 | CY | 15.01.2020 | CZ | 15.01.2020 | DK | 15.01.2020 | EE | 15.01.2020 | ES | 15.01.2020 | FI | 15.01.2020 | HR | 15.01.2020 | IT | 15.01.2020 | LT | 15.01.2020 | LV | 15.01.2020 | MC | 15.01.2020 | MK | 15.01.2020 | MT | 15.01.2020 | NL | 15.01.2020 | RO | 15.01.2020 | RS | 15.01.2020 | SE | 15.01.2020 | SI | 15.01.2020 | SK | 15.01.2020 | SM | 15.01.2020 | TR | 15.01.2020 | BG | 15.04.2020 | NO | 15.04.2020 | GR | 16.04.2020 | IS | 15.05.2020 | PT | 07.06.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 31.10.2014 | |
AL | 15.01.2020 | ||
AT | 15.01.2020 | ||
CY | 15.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
IT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
MT | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
TR | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 31.10.2014 | |
AT | 15.01.2020 | ||
CY | 15.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
IT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
MT | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
TR | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 15.01.2020 | |
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
IT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 15.01.2020 | |
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
IT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 15.01.2020 | |
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 15.01.2020 | |
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | NL | 15.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0711199 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [X] 1,2,4-10,13-16 * paragraphs [0008] - [0024] - [0038] - [0053]; examples 1,2,13,14; table IX * [I] 11; | [XI]US2010196750 (KAJITA ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10,12,14-16,18 * Examples: Sample 1, Sample 3, Sample 18, Sample 26; paragraphs [0055] - [0066]; figure 4 *[I] 11,17,19,20; | [XAI]US2013171499 (YANG JAE WON [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10,12,14-16,18 * paragraphs [0101] - [0131]; examples 2-1, 2-2, 2-3 * [A] 4,13 [I] 11,17,19,20 | International search | [A]JP2001250529 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD); | [X]KR20080106881 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20090056811 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20130006674 (IBM [US]); | [A]KR20130097679 (UNIV SUNGKYUNKWAN RES & BUS [KR]) | by applicant | KR20070000231 |