EP3063934 - METHODS AND APPARATUS RELATING TO IMAGE STABILIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2020 [2020/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Light Labs Inc. 636 Ramona Street Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | [2018/26] |
Former [2016/36] | For all designated states The Lightco Inc. 636 Ramona Street Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAROIA, Rajiv 7 Springcroft Road Far Hills, NJ 07931 / US | 02 /
SHROFF, Sapna A. 1000 Escalon Avenue Apt. O-1119 Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | [2016/36] | Representative(s) | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/36] | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14859084.7 | 01.11.2014 | [2016/36] | WO2014US63601 | Priority number, date | US201361899097P | 01.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361899097 P | US201414530682 | 31.10.2014 Original published format: US201414530682 | US201414530687 | 31.10.2014 Original published format: US201414530687 | [2016/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015066571 | Date: | 07.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3063934 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.05.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/77, H04N5/76, H04N5/225, H04N5/232, H04N13/02, H04N5/247, G02B27/64 | [2017/29] | CPC: |
G02B27/646 (EP,US);
H04N23/6812 (EP,US);
G02B27/58 (US);
H04N13/232 (EP,US);
H04N23/15 (EP);
H04N23/45 (EP);
H04N23/57 (EP,US);
H04N23/667 (EP,US);
H04N23/67 (EP,US);
H04N23/68 (EP,US);
H04N23/6845 (EP,US);
H04N23/687 (EP,US);
H04N23/698 (US);
H04N23/90 (EP,US);
H04N5/77 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10052 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/36] | H04N5/77, H04N5/76 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT BILDSTABILISIERUNG | [2016/36] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS RELATING TO IMAGE STABILIZATION | [2016/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREILS DE STABILISATION D'IMAGE | [2016/36] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 01.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/36] | 09.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/53] | 25.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US5850352 (MOEZZI SAIED [US], et al); | [A]EP1826721 (MORPHO INC [JP]); | [A]US2009244301 (BORDER JOHN N [US], et al); | [A]US2010026839 (BORDER JOHN N [US], et al); | [Y]US2011141227 (BIGIOI PETRONEL [IE], et al); | [A]US2011141228 (SHIMADA JUNJI [JP]) | International search | [A]US2003185551 (CHEN WEN CHING [TW]); | [A]JP2007164258 (KURASHIKI BOSEKI KK); | [A]JP2007201915 (YAMAHA CORP); | [Y]US2009225203 (TANIDA JUN [JP], et al); | [Y]US2010013906 (BORDER JOHN N [US], et al) | by applicant | US5850352 | US2011141227 |