EP3068305 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR A SAMPLE COLLECTION DEVICE WITH A NOVELTY EXTERIOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Theranos IP Company, LLC 7333 Gateway Boulevard Newark, CA 94560 / US | [2018/42] |
Former [2018/04] | For all designated states Theranos, Inc. 7333 Gateway Blvd Newark, CA 94560 / US | ||
Former [2016/38] | For all designated states Theranos, Inc. 1701 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KO, Pey-Jiun 1701 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | 02 /
HOLMES, Elizabeth 1701 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | [2016/38] | Representative(s) | Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 JJ Thomson Avenue Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/38] | Chapman, Paul William, et al Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 J J Thomson Ave Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | Application number, filing date | 14859931.9 | 11.11.2014 | [2016/38] | WO2014US65087 | Priority number, date | US201361902777P | 11.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361902777 P | [2016/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015070247 | Date: | 14.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3068305 | Date: | 21.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 14.05.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/15, A61B5/153, A61B10/00, A61B10/02, G01N1/02 | [2017/25] | CPC: |
A61B5/150839 (EP,US);
A61B10/0045 (EP,US);
A61B10/02 (EP,US);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/15003 (EP,US);
A61B5/150076 (EP,US);
A61B5/150236 (EP,US);
A61B5/150244 (EP,US);
A61B5/150312 (US);
A61B5/150343 (EP,US);
A61B5/150389 (EP,US);
A61B5/150503 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/38] | A61B5/15, G01N1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME FÜR EINE PROBENAHMEVORRICHTUNG MIT NEUARTIGEM ÄUSSEREN | [2016/38] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR A SAMPLE COLLECTION DEVICE WITH A NOVELTY EXTERIOR | [2016/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES POUR UN DISPOSITIF DE PRÉLÈVEMENT D'ÉCHANTILLON AVEC UNE PARTIE EXTÉRIEURE INNOVANTE | [2016/38] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/38] | 29.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 07.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/33] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 29.03.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 29.03.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.04.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3299891 (SMETON ROBERT L) [X] 1,7,8,11 * the whole document * [I] 2-6,9,10; | [XI]KR100834541B (AHN JUN SEO [KR]) [X] 1,7,8,11 * abstract * [I] 2-6,9,10; | [XI]US2009157012 (MAGNE LUC [CA]) [X] 1,7,8,11 * the whole document * [I] 2-6,9,10; | [XI]AU2008101111 (COOK Y, et al) [X] 1,7,8,11 * the whole document * [I] 2-6,9,10; | [XI]DE8900354U (BONDULICH, IVAN HENRY) [X] 1,7,8,11 * the whole document * [I] 2-6,9,10; | [XI]KR200195386Y (KIM JOO SANG [KR]) [X] 1,7,8,11 * abstract * [I] 2-6,9,10; | [XI]US2845065 (DANIEL GABRIEL) [X] 1,7,8,11 * the whole document * [I] 2-6,9,10 | International search | [X]US2012061286 (HUEB DE MENEZES OLIVEIRA MARIA ANGELICA [BR], et al); | [Y]US4994068 (HUFNAGLE DOUGLAS R [US]); | [Y]US5951493 (DOUGLAS JOEL S [US], et al); | [Y]US2002082564 (PHAM TUAN [US]) | by applicant | US2012061286 | US3299891 | KR100834541B | US2009157012 | AU2008101111 | DE8900354U | KR200195386Y | US2845065 | WO2014039909 | WO2014145935 | WO2014088606 | US8088593 | US8380541 | WO2012US57155 |