EP3067796 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, RECORDING MEDIUM, CALCULATION PROCESSING DEVICE, CALCULATION PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2016/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AOYAMA, Toshikazu c/o NEC CORPORATION 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | 02 /
IMAI, Teruyuki c/o NEC CORPORATION 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | 03 /
ISHII, Yasuo c/o NEC CORPORATION 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2016/37] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2016/37] | Application number, filing date | 14860668.4 | 05.11.2014 | [2016/37] | WO2014JP05561 | Priority number, date | JP20130232197 | 08.11.2013 Original published format: JP 2013232197 | [2016/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015068382 | Date: | 14.05.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3067796 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.05.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50, G06F9/48 | [2016/37] | CPC: |
G06F9/4812 (EP,KR,US);
G06F9/3885 (KR);
G06F9/54 (KR);
G06F2209/481 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/37] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM, BERECHNUNGSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND BERECHNUNGSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN | [2016/37] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, RECORDING MEDIUM, CALCULATION PROCESSING DEVICE, CALCULATION PROCESSING METHOD | [2016/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS PROCÉDÉ, SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT, DISPOSITIF DE CALCUL, PROCÉDÉ DE CALCUL | [2016/37] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2016 | Translation filed | 07.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 07.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/37] | 10.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.03.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 29.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/15] | 01.03.2024 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/15] | Appeal following examination | 25.06.2021 | Appeal received No. T1943/21 | 25.06.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 06.09.2021 | Statement of grounds filed | 01.03.2024 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6304963 (ELWOOD MATTHEW PAUL [US]) [I] 1-26 * figures 1,8 * * column 2, lines 53-65 * * column 6, lines 50-53; figure 1 * * column 11, lines 13-23 * * column 11, lines 47-60 *; | [A]US2010121984 (OKA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-26 * paragraph [0004] *; | [A]US2013138850 (YAMASHITA KOICHRIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-26 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0010] * | International search | [Y]JP2000029866 (ARM LTD.); | [Y] - TAKUYA NAGATA ET AL., "SPE Observer: An OS Monitoring System Running on an SPE in Cell /B.E.", IPSJ SIG NOTES, 2011 (HEISEI 23) NENDO ?6? [ DVD -ROM, (20120415), no. 120, pages 1 - 8, XP055342772 | by applicant | JPH0619856 | JP2008165318 | JP2013232197 |