EP3066623 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPTIMIZING PATIENT MANAGEMENT IN A CARE FACILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2018 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lacy, Clifton R. P.O. Box 1458 Highlands, New Jersey 08904 / US | [2016/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2016/37] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2016/37] | Application number, filing date | 14861010.8 | 07.11.2014 | [2016/37] | WO2014US64594 | Priority number, date | US201361901536P | 08.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361901536 P | [2016/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015070042 | Date: | 14.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3066623 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.05.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00, G06F19/00, G06Q10/10, G06Q10/06, G06Q50/22 | [2017/29] | CPC: |
G16H70/20 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
G16H40/20 (EP,US);
G16H40/63 (US)
|
Former IPC [2016/37] | G06Q10/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/37] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR PATIENTENMANAGEMENT-OPTIMIERUNG IN EINER BETREUUNGSEINRICHTUNG | [2016/37] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPTIMIZING PATIENT MANAGEMENT IN A CARE FACILITY | [2016/37] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'OPTIMISATION DE GESTION DE PATIENTS DANS UN CENTRE DE SANTÉ | [2016/37] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 08.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/37] | 18.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/30] | 06.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007156456 (MCGILLIN MADELYN [US], et al) [X] 1,10 * paragraphs 5,11,16,17,22, claim13 *[I] 2-9,11-19; | [XI]US2012016691 (SIEVENPIPER CRISPIAN [US], et al) [X] 1,10 * summary, abstract, paragraphs 19-20,24,25-29,39-41,47, fig.1 * [I] 2-9,11-19 | International search | [X]US2007106536 (MOORE JAMES F [US]); | [Y]US2007288285 (NILSSON AGNETA [SE]); | [A]US2008183069 (FUJIMOTO KATSUHIKO [JP]); | [A]US7925603 (LAIDIG WILLIAM A [US], et al); | [A]US2012065987 (FAROOQ FAISAL [US], et al); | [A]US2013096444 (CONDURSO JOSEPH [US], et al) |