EP3069970 - MULTI-FUNCTIONAL TURN SIGNAL LAMP FOR BICYCLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2020 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lee, Sang-lae 102 Ga-dong Hyundai Villa 25 Naengcheon-ro 12beon-gil Manan-gu Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do 430-821 / KR | [2016/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2016/38] | Representative(s) | Twelmeier Mommer & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Westliche Karl-Friedrich-Strasse 56-68 75172 Pforzheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/38] | Twelmeier Mommer & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Westliche Karl-Friedrich-Strasse 56-68 75172 Pforzheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 14862505.6 | 24.06.2014 | [2016/38] | WO2014KR05552 | Priority number, date | KR20130138573 | 14.11.2013 Original published format: KR 20130138573 | KR20130138574 | 14.11.2013 Original published format: KR 20130138574 | [2016/38] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015072644 | Date: | 21.05.2015 | Language: | KO | [2015/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3069970 | Date: | 21.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.05.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B62J6/00, B60Q1/34, B62J99/00, B62K21/26, B62J17/00, // B62J3/00, B62J29/00 | [2019/16] | CPC: |
B62K21/26 (EP,US);
B21K21/16 (KR);
B60Q1/34 (CN,KR);
B62J3/10 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B62J43/30 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B62J45/10 (EP,US);
B62J6/01 (KR);
B62J6/015 (US);
B62J6/02 (KR);
B62J6/028 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B62J6/045 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B62J6/056 (EP,CN,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/27] | B62J6/00, B60Q1/34, B62J99/00, B62K21/26, // B62J3/00, B62J29/00 | ||
Former IPC [2016/38] | B62J6/00, B60Q1/34, B62J99/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/38] | Title | German: | MULTIFUNKTIONALE DREHUNGSSIGNALLAMPE FÜR EIN FAHRRAD | [2016/38] | English: | MULTI-FUNCTIONAL TURN SIGNAL LAMP FOR BICYCLE | [2016/38] | French: | FEU DE CHANGEMENT DE DIRECTION MULTIFONCTIONS POUR VÉLO | [2016/38] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2016 | Translation filed | 31.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2016 | Search fee paid | 31.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/38] | 28.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/09] | 02.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   07.07.2017 | 30.06.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2011051442 (CHANG CHIN-YU [TW]) [I] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008087430 (H GROSSMAN LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,5,6 * figures 1(a) - 11; claims 27,28 *; | [A]CN2273271Y (YIN JIANYONG [CN]) [A] 1,5 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]AU2011265526 (SONIC GRIP LTD [AU]) [A] 1,5,10 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2011115614 (HUANG CHIEN-CHANG [TW], et al) [A] 1,2 * figures 1-11 *; | [A]CN201484605U (ZONG YIH RUBBER IND CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * figures 1-7 *; | [X]EP1520773 (SHIMANO KK [JP]) [X] 1,4 * figures 1-9; claim 15 *; | [A]US2013152726 (MIKI YOSHIMITSU [JP], et al) [A] 5,9,11 * figures 1-14 *; | [A]US2011103885 (LI JIN-CANG [TW]) [A] 5,9,11 * figures 1-7 *; | [A]CN200952677Y (KE JUNZHI [CN]) [A] 11-13 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4656564 (FELDER WILLIE L [US]) [A] 1-13 * figures 1-6 * | International search | [A]KR20110082376 (SOHN DAE UP [KR]); | [A]KR101209368B (PARK DONG SOO [KR]); | [X]KR20130003812U (PARK, DONG SOO) |