EP3071043 - A NOVEL COMPOSITION AND METHOD OF USE TO CONTROL PATHOGENS AND PREVENT DISEASES IN SEEDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agri-Néo Inc. 435 Horner Avenue, Unit 1 Toronto, ON M8W 4W3 / CA | [2016/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAGHER, Fadi 1002 Rue des Pervenches Laval, Québec H7Y 2H8 / CA | 02 /
DILLON, Nicholas 11 Christie Street Unit 705 Toronto, Ontario M6G 3B1 / CA | 03 /
UNGAR, Kenneth Sherman 14 Bexhill Avenue Scarborough, Ontario M1L 3B4 / CA | [2016/39] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/39] | Lavoix Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14863134.4 | 13.11.2014 | [2016/39] | WO2014CA51088 | Priority number, date | US201361907560P | 22.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361907560 P | [2016/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015074144 | Date: | 28.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3071043 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 28.05.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A23B9/24, A01N25/30, A01N37/16, A01N59/00, A01P1/00, A01P3/00, A23B9/26, A23B9/30, A01N25/00, A01N31/02, A23L3/3508, A23L3/358, A01N37/02 | [2017/22] | CPC: |
A23B9/26 (EP,US);
A01N25/00 (EP,US);
A01N31/02 (US);
A01N37/02 (US);
A01N37/16 (EP,US);
A23B9/08 (EP,US);
A23B9/30 (EP,US);
A23L3/3481 (US);
A23L3/3508 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A01N37/16, A01N25/02, A01N59/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/39] | A23B9/24, A01N25/30, A01N37/16, A01N59/00, A01P1/00, A01P3/00, A23B9/26, A23B9/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/39] | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER BEKÄMPFUNG VON PATHOGENEN UND VORBEUGUNG VON KRANKHEITEN BEI SAMEN | [2016/39] | English: | A NOVEL COMPOSITION AND METHOD OF USE TO CONTROL PATHOGENS AND PREVENT DISEASES IN SEEDS | [2016/39] | French: | NOUVELLE COMPOSITION ET PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION POUR LUTTER CONTRE DES PATHOGÈNES ET PRÉVENIR DES MALADIES DANS DES SEMENCES | [2016/39] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 21.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 21.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/39] | 05.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/25] | 07.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/25] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 05.12.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 05.12.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.01.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 05.12.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 05.12.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.01.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2003211169 (TABASSO RENATO [IT]) [I] 1-15* paragraphs [0030] - [0050] - [0253]; examples 2,3,18; claim - * | International search | [A]CA2056503 (ROESLER RICHARD [DE], et al); | [A]CA2692202 (ECOLAB INC [US]); | [Y]CA2814794 (AGRI NEO INC [CA]); | [Y]US2013259957 (DAGHER FADI [CA], et al); | [Y] - PAO ET AL., "Utilizing Acidic Sprays for Eliminating Salmonella enterica on Raw almonds", JOURNAL OF FOOD SCIENCE, (200601), vol. 71, no. 1, pages M14 - M 19, XP055344443 | [Y] - WEISSINGER ET AL., "Comparison of aqueous chemical treatments to eliminate Salmonella on alfalfa seeds", JOURNAL OF FOOD PROTECTION, (2000), vol. 63, no. 11, pages 1475 - 82, XP055345473 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4315/0362-028X-63.11.1475 | [A] - BEUCHAT ET AL., "Efficacy of Sanitizers in Reducing Salmonella on Pecan Nutmeats during Cracking and Shelling", JOURNAL OF FOOD PROTECTION, (20121206), vol. 76, no. 5, pages 770 - 778, XP055344448 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4315/0362-028X.JFP-12-541 | [A] - BUCHOLZ ET AL., "Reduciton of Salmonella on alfalfa seeds using peroxyacetic acid and a commercial seed washer is as effective as treatment with 20000 ppm of Ca(OCl)2", LETTERS IN APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY, (2010), vol. 51, no. 4, pages 462 - 468, XP055125630 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1472-765X.2010.02929.x | by applicant | US2512640 | WO9502330 | EP0648418 | FR2728171 | US6024986 | US6165483 | GB2355198 | US6238685 | US2003211169 | WO2007092180 | US7291276 | CA2569025 | WO2012051699 | US2013259957 | - OMRI, NOSB TAP Materials database compiled, (20001100), page 7 | - MENA et al., "influence of Ethanol on Probiotic and Culture Bacteria Lactobacillus bulgaricus and Streptococcus thermophilus within a Therapeutic Product", Open Journal of Medical Microbiology, (20120000), vol. 2, pages 70 - 76 | - SMITH et al., "Microbial Synergia via an Ethanol-Triggered Pathway", Molecular and Cellular Biology, (20040500), doi:10.1128/MCB.24.9.3874-3884.2004, pages 3874 - 3884, XP008112867 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/MCB.24.9.3874-3884.2004 |