EP3074928 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR FACE RECOGNITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fazl Ersi, Ehsan 99 Harbour Square Suite 3801 Toronto, Ontario M5J2H2 / CA | For all designated states Tsotsos, John Konstantine 182 Strathearn Avenue Richmond Hill, Ontario L4B2S6 / CA | [2016/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2016/40] | Representative(s) | Ellmeyer, Wolfgang Häupl & Ellmeyer KG Patentanwaltskanzlei Mariahilfer Strasse 50 1070 Wien / AT | [2016/40] | Application number, filing date | 14864771.2 | 24.11.2014 | [2016/40] | WO2014CA51117 | Priority number, date | US201361908212P | 25.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361908212 P | [2016/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015074157 | Date: | 28.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3074928 | Date: | 05.10.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 28.05.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/80, G06K9/36, G06K9/68, G06K9/00, G06K9/46 | [2017/31] | CPC: |
G06V40/171 (EP,US);
G06V10/50 (EP,US);
G06V40/168 (US);
G06V40/172 (US)
|
Former IPC [2016/40] | G06K9/80, G06K9/36, G06K9/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/40] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR GESICHTSERKENNUNG | [2016/40] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR FACE RECOGNITION | [2016/40] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE RECONNAISSANCE FACIALE | [2016/40] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 02.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/40] | 15.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/46] | 25.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - YONG XU ET AL, "Scale-space texture description on SIFT-like textons", COMPUTER VISION AND IMAGE UNDERSTANDING, ACADEMIC PRESS, US, vol. 116, no. 9, doi:10.1016/J.CVIU.2012.05.003, ISSN 1077-3142, (20120514), pages 999 - 1013, (20120524), XP028400033 [X] 1,2,5-7,10 * sections 3.1 and 3.2;; figure 5 * [I] 3,4,8,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cviu.2012.05.003 | [XI] - YONG XU ET AL, "Combining powerful local and global statistics for texture description", IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION. PROCEEDINGS, US, (20090101), doi:10.1109/CVPR.2009.5206741, ISSN 1063-6919, pages 573 - 580, XP055380505 [X] 1-4,7,10 * Section 3 * [I] 5,6,8,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR.2009.5206741 | [XI] - DAVID G. LOWE, "Distinctive Image Features from Scale-Invariant Keypoints", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF COMPUTER VISION, (20040105), vol. 60, no. 2, doi:10.1023/B:VISI.0000029664.99615.94, ISSN 0920-5691, pages 91 - 110, XP055203065 [X] 1,2,5-7,9,10 * Sections 3, 5, and 8 * [I] 3,4,8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/B:VISI.0000029664.99615.94 | International search | [A]EP2064652 (IMP INNOVATIONS LTD [GB]); | [A]WO2011069023 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) |