EP3054503 - BATTERY MODULE HAVING STACKED CARTRIDGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2016/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONG, Byung O LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Hyun Chul LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2016/32] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/01] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2016/32] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 14866442.8 | 19.11.2014 | [2016/32] | WO2014KR11102 | Priority number, date | KR20130147108 | 29.11.2013 Original published format: KR 20130147108 | [2016/32] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015080421 | Date: | 04.06.2015 | Language: | KO | [2015/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3054503 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3054503 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/20, H01M2/10, H01M2/02, H01M10/6556, // H01M10/52, H01M10/6566, H01M10/647 | [2020/40] | CPC: |
H01M10/6556 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/50 (KR);
H01M10/6557 (US);
H01M10/0525 (US);
H01M10/52 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/613 (US);
H01M10/625 (US);
H01M10/647 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/105 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/211 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/264 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/291 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/503 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/512 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/516 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/529 (US);
H01M50/531 (KR);
H01M50/55 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/553 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/6566 (EP);
H01M2220/10 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/32] | H01M2/20, H01M2/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIEMODUL MIT GESTAPELTEN KARTUSCHEN | [2016/32] | English: | BATTERY MODULE HAVING STACKED CARTRIDGES | [2016/32] | French: | MODULE DE BATTERIE AYANT DES CARTOUCHES EMPILÉES | [2016/32] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2016 | Translation filed | 04.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2016 | Search fee paid | 04.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/32] | 26.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.11.2014 | AL | 30.12.2020 | AT | 30.12.2020 | CY | 30.12.2020 | CZ | 30.12.2020 | DK | 30.12.2020 | EE | 30.12.2020 | ES | 30.12.2020 | FI | 30.12.2020 | HR | 30.12.2020 | IT | 30.12.2020 | LT | 30.12.2020 | LV | 30.12.2020 | MC | 30.12.2020 | MK | 30.12.2020 | MT | 30.12.2020 | NL | 30.12.2020 | PL | 30.12.2020 | RO | 30.12.2020 | RS | 30.12.2020 | SE | 30.12.2020 | SI | 30.12.2020 | SK | 30.12.2020 | SM | 30.12.2020 | BG | 30.03.2021 | NO | 30.03.2021 | GR | 31.03.2021 | IS | 30.04.2021 | PT | 30.04.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 19.11.2014 | |
AL | 30.12.2020 | ||
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CY | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
MK | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
SM | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 19.11.2014 | |
AL | 30.12.2020 | ||
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CY | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
SM | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 19.11.2014 | |
AL | 30.12.2020 | ||
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CY | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/28] | HU | 19.11.2014 | |
AL | 30.12.2020 | ||
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 30.12.2020 | |
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 30.12.2020 | |
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 30.12.2020 | |
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 30.12.2020 | |
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 30.12.2020 | |
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | CZ | 30.12.2020 | |
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 30.12.2020 | |
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 30.12.2020 | |
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | FI | 30.12.2020 | |
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 30.12.2020 | |
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 30.12.2020 | |
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 30.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011039131 (MOON DEAYON [KR]) [A] 1 * abstract ** paragraph [0077] *; | [I]WO2012151190 (BRIGHT AUTOMOTIVE INC [US], et al) [I] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0030] , [0053] - [0061] *; | [E]EP2991133 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [E] 1-9,11-17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0024] - [0039] - [0053] - [0062] *; | [E]EP3018733 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [E] 1,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] , [0057]; claim 11 * | International search | [A]JP2001135674 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO); | [Y]KR100689574B (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL KK); | [A]KR20100081942 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20120081821 (V ENS [KR]); | [A]KR101277250B (LG CHEM. LTD.) | Examination | WO2013089468 | by applicant | WO2004KR03312 |