EP3076338 - CARD READER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.2019 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Information & Communications Co., Ltd. Sejong-daero 39 Jung-gu Seoul 100-743 / KR | [2016/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOON, Sang-Jin 506-204 Samsung Raemian 2-Cha APT. 74 Gireum-ro Seongbuk-gu Seoul 136-749 / KR | [2016/40] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited Mill House North Street York YO1 6JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/05] | HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St. Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | ||
Former [2016/40] | Gover, Richard Paul, et al HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14866465.9 | 24.10.2014 | [2016/40] | WO2014KR10067 | Priority number, date | KR20130147045 | 29.11.2013 Original published format: KR 20130147045 | [2016/40] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015080384 | Date: | 04.06.2015 | Language: | KO | [2015/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3076338 | Date: | 05.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3076338 | Date: | 30.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/00, G06K13/08 | [2017/30] | CPC: |
G06K7/0004 (EP,US);
G06K17/00 (KR);
G06K13/0875 (EP,US);
G06K7/0078 (US)
|
Former IPC [2016/40] | G06K17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KARTENLESER | [2016/40] | English: | CARD READER | [2016/40] | French: | LECTEUR DE CARTE | [2016/40] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2016 | Translation filed | 03.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 03.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/40] | 11.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 31.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.10.2014 | AL | 30.01.2019 | AT | 30.01.2019 | CY | 30.01.2019 | CZ | 30.01.2019 | DK | 30.01.2019 | EE | 30.01.2019 | ES | 30.01.2019 | FI | 30.01.2019 | HR | 30.01.2019 | IT | 30.01.2019 | LT | 30.01.2019 | LV | 30.01.2019 | MC | 30.01.2019 | MK | 30.01.2019 | MT | 30.01.2019 | NL | 30.01.2019 | PL | 30.01.2019 | RO | 30.01.2019 | RS | 30.01.2019 | SE | 30.01.2019 | SI | 30.01.2019 | SK | 30.01.2019 | SM | 30.01.2019 | TR | 30.01.2019 | BG | 30.04.2019 | NO | 30.04.2019 | GR | 01.05.2019 | IS | 30.05.2019 | PT | 30.05.2019 | IE | 24.10.2019 | LU | 24.10.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 24.10.2014 | |
AL | 30.01.2019 | ||
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CY | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
MT | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
TR | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
IE | 24.10.2019 | ||
LU | 24.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 24.10.2014 | |
AL | 30.01.2019 | ||
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CY | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
TR | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
IE | 24.10.2019 | ||
LU | 24.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CY | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
TR | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
IE | 24.10.2019 | ||
LU | 24.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
TR | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
IE | 24.10.2019 | ||
LU | 24.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
TR | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
LU | 24.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
TR | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
TR | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 30.01.2019 | |
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | ES | 30.01.2019 | |
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 30.01.2019 | |
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 30.01.2019 | |
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 30.01.2019 | |
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 30.01.2019 | |
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 30.01.2019 | |
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 30.01.2019 | |
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0429976 (URMET SPA [IT]) [X] 1,3 * column 2, paragraph l - column 3, paragraph f *; | [I]EP0712087 (AT & T GLOBAL INF SOLUTION [US]) [I] 1,3* column 4, line 27 - column 9, line 20 * | International search | [Y]JP3360002B (OKI ELECTRIC INDUSTRY CO., LTD.); | [A]KR20110050002 (DAESUNG L & A CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR101143856B (KOREA INFORMATION & AMP COMM CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR200468168Y (KOREA INFORMATION & COMMUNICATIONS CO., LTD.) |