EP3078606 - AEROSOL HOUSING MECHANISM AND AEROSOL PRODUCT PROVIDED WITH SAID AEROSOL HOUSING MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitani Valve Co., Ltd. 12-20, Nihonbashi Honcho 4-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0023 / JP | For all designated states Daizo Corporation 1-201, Fukuzaki 3-chome Minato-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 552-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2016/41] | For all designated states Mitani Valve Co., Ltd. 12-20, Nihonbashi Honcho 4-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0023 / JP | ||
For all designated states Daizo Corporation 1-201, Fukuzaki 3-chome Minato-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 552-0013 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEKI, Masaaki c/o MITANI VALVE CO. LTD. 12-20 Nihonbashi-honcho 4-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0023 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Masato c/o MITANI VALVE CO. LTD. 12-20 Nihonbashi-honcho 4-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0023 / JP | 03 /
OWADA, Ryoichi c/o DAIZO Corporation Aerosol-Division Kyoto-Factory 704 Yodomizu-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 613-0916 / JP | [2016/41] | Representative(s) | Klingseisen, Franz Klingseisen, Rings & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | [2016/41] | Application number, filing date | 14867024.3 | 28.11.2014 | [2016/41] | WO2014JP81568 | Priority number, date | JP20130250442 | 03.12.2013 Original published format: JP 2013250442 | JP20140093537 | 30.04.2014 Original published format: JP 2014093537 | [2016/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015083642 | Date: | 11.06.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3078606 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3078606 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/38, B65D83/44, B65D83/62 | [2017/36] | CPC: |
B65D83/38 (EP,KR,US);
B65D83/44 (EP,KR,US);
B65D83/62 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/41] | B65D83/38, B05B9/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AEROSOLGEHÄUSEMECHANISMUS UND AEROSOLPRODUKT MIT BESAGTEM AEROSOLGEHÄUSEMECHANISMUS | [2016/41] | English: | AEROSOL HOUSING MECHANISM AND AEROSOL PRODUCT PROVIDED WITH SAID AEROSOL HOUSING MECHANISM | [2016/41] | French: | MÉCANISME RENFERMANT UN AÉROSOL ET PRODUIT D'AÉROSOL FOURNI AVEC LEDIT MÉCANISME RENFERMANT UN AÉROSOL | [2016/41] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2016 | Translation filed | 24.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 24.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/41] | 01.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.11.2014 | AL | 18.11.2020 | AT | 18.11.2020 | CY | 18.11.2020 | CZ | 18.11.2020 | DK | 18.11.2020 | EE | 18.11.2020 | ES | 18.11.2020 | FI | 18.11.2020 | HR | 18.11.2020 | IT | 18.11.2020 | LT | 18.11.2020 | LV | 18.11.2020 | MC | 18.11.2020 | MK | 18.11.2020 | MT | 18.11.2020 | NL | 18.11.2020 | PL | 18.11.2020 | RO | 18.11.2020 | RS | 18.11.2020 | SE | 18.11.2020 | SI | 18.11.2020 | SK | 18.11.2020 | SM | 18.11.2020 | TR | 18.11.2020 | IE | 28.11.2020 | LU | 28.11.2020 | BE | 30.11.2020 | CH | 30.11.2020 | LI | 30.11.2020 | BG | 18.02.2021 | NO | 18.02.2021 | GR | 19.02.2021 | IS | 18.03.2021 | PT | 18.03.2021 | [2022/34] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 28.11.2014 | |
AL | 18.11.2020 | ||
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CY | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
MK | 18.11.2020 | ||
MT | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
TR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IE | 28.11.2020 | ||
LU | 28.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 28.11.2014 | |
AL | 18.11.2020 | ||
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CY | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
MT | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
TR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IE | 28.11.2020 | ||
LU | 28.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
IE | 28.11.2020 | ||
LU | 28.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
IE | 28.11.2020 | ||
LU | 28.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
IE | 28.11.2020 | ||
LU | 28.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
IE | 28.11.2020 | ||
LU | 28.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
IE | 28.11.2020 | ||
LU | 28.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
IE | 28.11.2020 | ||
LU | 28.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
LU | 28.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
LU | 28.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
LU | 28.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
LU | 28.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
LU | 28.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
LU | 28.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
LU | 28.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 18.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2206099 (VALOIS) [A] 4-9* the whole document *; | [A]US2009014679 (HYGEMA TERRY L [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0034]; figures 3-5 *; | [I]EP2216267 (MEADWESTVACO CALMAR INC [US]) [I] 1-3,9 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0047]; figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0059]; figures 7-13 *; | [A]EP2605857 (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0041]; figure - * | International search | [A]JPH08103700 (OSAKA SHIPBUILDING); | [Y]JP2000062870 (TOYO AEROSOL IND CO); | [Y]JP2000281159 (OSAKA SHIPBUILDING); | [Y]JP2006321532 (DAIZO KK); | [Y]JP2009521374 (VALOIS S.A.S.); | [Y]JP2012111549 (DAIZO KK) | by applicant | JPS623476U | JPH08169482 | JP2011136747 |