EP3076973 - COMBINATIONS OF HISTONE DEACETYLASE INHIBITORS AND IMMUNOMODULATORY DRUGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acetylon Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 70 Fargo Street, Suite 205 Boston, MA 02210 / US | [2016/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUAYLE, Steven, Norman 62 Linden Street 1, Brookline, MA 02445 / US | 02 /
JONES, Simon, Stewart 46 Westcott Road Harvard, MA 01451 / US | [2019/52] |
Former [2016/41] | 01 /
QUAYLE, Steven, Norman 62 Linden Street 1 Brookline, MA 02445 / US | ||
02 /
JONES, Simon, Stewart 46 Westcott Road Harvard, MA 01451 / US | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2020/18] |
Former [2016/41] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 14867332.0 | 03.12.2014 | [2016/41] | WO2014US68263 | Priority number, date | US201361911086P | 03.12.2013 Original published format: US 201361911086 P | US201462061368P | 08.10.2014 Original published format: US 201462061368 P | [2016/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015084905 | Date: | 11.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3076973 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3076973 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/505, A61K31/495, A61K31/16, A61P37/00, A61K31/454, A61K45/06, // A61P35/02 | [2017/35] | CPC: |
A61K31/505 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/404 (KR);
A61K31/4439 (KR,US);
A61K31/454 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/454, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/505, A61K2300/00 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2016/41] | A61K31/505, A61K31/495, A61K31/16, A61P37/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONEN AUS HISTONDEACTYLASEINHIBITOREN UND IMMUNMODULATORISCHEN ARZNEIMITTELN | [2016/41] | English: | COMBINATIONS OF HISTONE DEACETYLASE INHIBITORS AND IMMUNOMODULATORY DRUGS | [2016/41] | French: | COMBINAISONS D'INHIBITEURS D'HISTONE DÉSACÉTYLASE ET MÉDICAMENTS IMMUNOMODULATEURS | [2016/41] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2016 | Search fee paid | 01.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/41] | 23.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 09.10.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/14] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 09.10.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 09.10.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.10.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.12.2014 | AL | 29.04.2020 | AT | 29.04.2020 | CY | 29.04.2020 | CZ | 29.04.2020 | DK | 29.04.2020 | EE | 29.04.2020 | FI | 29.04.2020 | HR | 29.04.2020 | IT | 29.04.2020 | LT | 29.04.2020 | LV | 29.04.2020 | MC | 29.04.2020 | MK | 29.04.2020 | MT | 29.04.2020 | NL | 29.04.2020 | PL | 29.04.2020 | RO | 29.04.2020 | RS | 29.04.2020 | SE | 29.04.2020 | SI | 29.04.2020 | SK | 29.04.2020 | SM | 29.04.2020 | TR | 29.04.2020 | BG | 29.07.2020 | NO | 29.07.2020 | GR | 30.07.2020 | IS | 29.08.2020 | PT | 31.08.2020 | IE | 03.12.2020 | LU | 03.12.2020 | BE | 31.12.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 03.12.2014 | |
AL | 29.04.2020 | ||
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CY | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
MK | 29.04.2020 | ||
MT | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
TR | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
IE | 03.12.2020 | ||
LU | 03.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 03.12.2014 | |
AL | 29.04.2020 | ||
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CY | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
MT | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
TR | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
IE | 03.12.2020 | ||
LU | 03.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
IE | 03.12.2020 | ||
LU | 03.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
IE | 03.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 29.04.2020 | |
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 29.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2009227674 (RICHON VICTORIA M [US], et al) [X] 1,10-15 * [0005], [0022] [0025]; Fig. 1 *; | [XY]US2012190693 (VAN DUZER JOHN H [US], et al) [X] 1,10-15 * claims 12, 15; claim 9, first compound; last compound on p. 79; p. 30, third compound *[Y] 1-7,10-15; | [A]WO2013041480 (SIGMA TAU IND FARMACEUTI [IT]) [A] 1-3,10-15 * see p. 36, table 1 *; | [X] - GARDNER J M ET AL, "A novel regimen of vorinostat with interferon gamma for refractory Sezary syndrome", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF DERMATOLOGY, MOSBY, INC, US, vol. 61, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.JAAD.2008.11.889, ISSN 0190-9622, (20090701), pages 112 - 116, (20090617), XP026336032 [X] 1,10-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jaad.2008.11.889 | [XY] - TINT LWIN ET AL, "A microenvironment-mediated c-Myc/miR-548m/HDAC6 amplification loop in non-Hodgkin B cell lymphomas", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, US, (20131101), vol. 123, no. 11, doi:10.1172/JCI64210, ISSN 0021-9738, pages 4612 - 4626, XP055389682 [X] 1,10-15 * title, abstract; p. 4613, first §; Fig. 5D * [Y] 1-7,10-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI64210 | [A] - P Porcu ET AL, "Bexarotene-Induced T-Cell Immunomodulation and Response in CTCL. | Blood Journal", Blood 2004 104:744, (20040101), URL: http://www.bloodjournal.org/content/104/11/744, (20170711), XP055389612 [A] 1-7,10-15 * title, abstract * | [Y] - J Amengual, "Dual Targeting of Protein Degradation Pathways with the Selective HDAC6 Inhibitor Rocilinostat (ACY-1215) and Bortezomib, Demonstrates Synergistic Antitumor Activity in Preclinical Models of Lymphoma | Blood Journal", Blood 2012 120:1650, (20120101), URL: http://www.bloodjournal.org/content/120/21/1650?sso-checked=true, (20170710), XP055389512 [Y] 1-7,10-15 * abstract * | [XI] - Eva Sahakian ET AL, "Combination of ACY1215, a Selective Histone Deacetylase 6 (HDAC6) Inhibitor with the Bruton Tyrosine Kinase (BTK) Inhibitor, Ibrutinib, Represents a Novel Therapeutic Strategy in Mantle Cell Lymphoma (MCL) | Blood Journal", Blood, (20120101), URL: http://www.bloodjournal.org/content/120/21/1660?sso-checked=true, (20170407), XP055363021 [X] 1-3 * abstract * [I] 1-7,10-15 | [A] - Rohit Ghurye ET AL, "BET bromodomain inhibition by JQ1 suppresses interleukin-6 secretion in myeloma cells", (20130822), URL: http://www.frontiersin.org/10.3389/conf.fimmu.2013.02.00823/event_abstract, (20170710), XP055389460 [A] 1-7,9-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3389/conf.fimmu.2013.02.00823 | [A] - SCOTT L J ET AL, "Mitoxantrone: A review of its use in multiple sclerosis", EMBASE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (2004), Database accession no. EMB-2004210614, XP002771975 [A] 1-7,9-15 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US2010098657 (SCHAFER PETER H [US], et al); | [A]US2011280849 (ZHANG XIAOKUI [US], et al); | [X]US2012121502 (VAN DUZER JOHN H [US], et al); | [A]WO2013013113 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US], et al); | [X]US2013225543 (JONES SIMON S [US], et al) | by applicant | US5635517 | US6281230 | US6335349 | US6476052 | - TINT LWIN et al., "A microenvironment-mediated c-Myc/miR-548m/HDAC6 amplification loop in non-Hodgkin B cell lymphomas", Journal of Clinical Investigation, (20131101), vol. 123, no. 11, doi:doi:10.1172/JCI64210, ISSN 0021-9738, pages 4612 - 4626, XP055389682 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI64210 | - J AMENGUAL, Blood Journal, Blood, (20120101), vol. 120, page 1650 | - SAHAKIAN EVA et al., Blood & 54th annual meeting and exposition of the American-Society-of-hematology (Ash), (20121100), vol. 120, no. 21, page 1660, XP055363021 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, Mack Publishing Company, (19850000), page 1418 | - Journal of Pharmaceutical Science, (19770000), vol. 66, no. 2 | - HOLFORD, N. H. G.; SCHEINER, L. B., Clin. Pharmacokinet., (19810000), vol. 6, pages 429 - 453 | - LOEWE, S.; MUISCHNEK, H., Arch. Exp. Pathol Pharmacol., (19260000), vol. 114, pages 313 - 326 | - CHOU, T. C.; TALALAY, P., Adv. Enzyme Regul., (19840000), vol. 22, pages 27 - 55 | WO1997US13375 | WO2011US21982 |