EP3081540 - SLUDGE TREATMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2020 [2020/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nanjing Delei Science Tecnology Co., Ltd 302 Building 7 R D Area 3 Xuzhuang Software Park 699-27 Xuanwu Road, Xuanwu District Nanjing, Jiangsu 210000 / CN | [2016/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Hao 302 Building 7 R D Area 3 Xuzhuang Software Park, 699-27 XuanwuRoad, Xuanwu District Nanjing Jiangsu 210000 / CN | [2016/42] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2016/42] | Osha Liang 2, rue de la Paix 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 14867623.2 | 29.04.2014 | [2016/42] | WO2014CN76433 | Priority number, date | CN201310645801 | 03.12.2013 Original published format: CN201310645801 | [2016/42] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015081658 | Date: | 11.06.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3081540 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C02F11/06 | [2016/42] | CPC: |
C02F11/06 (EP,US);
C02F11/02 (US);
C02F11/122 (EP,US);
C02F11/14 (EP,US);
C02F9/00 (EP,US);
C02F1/004 (EP,US);
C02F1/78 (EP,US);
C02F2201/007 (EP,US);
C02F2201/782 (EP,US);
C02F2203/006 (EP,US);
C02F2209/38 (EP,US);
C02F2303/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/42] | Title | German: | SCHLAMMBEHANDLUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2016/42] | English: | SLUDGE TREATMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD THEREFOR | [2016/42] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DES BOUES ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | [2016/42] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2016 | Translation filed | 21.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 21.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/42] | 29.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/06] | 20.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008078719 (FABIYI MALCOLM EZEKIEL [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6 * figure 3 * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0033] * [I] 2,4,7-10; | [XI]DE19625985 (CSONTOS GEORG DIPL ING [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6 * Figure 1.2 * [I] 2,4,7-10; | [A]US2004149664 (RAEDER HENRIK [NO], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 4 * * paragraph [0026] *; | [A]US2007295666 (BRADLEY KIRK D [US]) [A] 1-10 * figures 7,8 * | International search | [Y]JP2008018309 (YASKAWA ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]CN102617004 (TIANJIN CARING TECHNOLOGY DEV CO LTD); | [X]CN202415337U (WENZHOU OUFEILI ENVIRONMENTAL PROT TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [Y]CN103058480 (HUNAN KINGHOOD ENVIRONMENTAL PROT TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [XP]CN103663895 (SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY NANJING DELEI CO LTD); | [E]CN203602470U (SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY NANJING DELEI CO LTD) |