EP3076975 - METHODS OF TREATING AND PREVENTING ALLOANTIBODY DRIVEN CHRONIC GRAFT VERSUS HOST DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.07.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharmacyclics LLC 1 N. Waukegan Road North Chicago, IL 60064 / US | For all designated states Regents Of The University Of Minnesota 200 Oak Street SE, Suite 600 Minneapolis, Minnesota 55455 / US | [2022/19] |
Former [2017/35] | For all designated states Pharmacyclics LLC 995 East Arques Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | ||
For all designated states Regents Of The University Of Minnesota 200 Oak Street SE, Suite 600 Minneapolis, Minnesota 55455 / US | |||
Former [2016/41] | For all designated states Pharmacyclics, LLC 995 East Arques Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | ||
For all designated states Regents Of The University Of Minnesota 200 Oak Street SE, Suite 600 Minneapolis, Minnesota 55455 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLAZAR, Bruce, R. 4350 Sussex Road Golden Valley, MN 55416 / US | 02 /
FLYNN, Ryan 15 22nd Avenue NE Minneapolis, MN 55418 / US | [2016/41] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/41] | Williams, Richard Andrew Norman HGF Limited 140 London Wall London EC2Y 5DN / GB | Application number, filing date | 14867905.3 | 02.12.2014 | [2016/41] | WO2014US68177 | Priority number, date | US201361910944P | 02.12.2013 Original published format: US 201361910944 P | US201461973178P | 31.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461973178 P | [2016/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015084857 | Date: | 11.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3076975 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/519, A61P37/00, A61P43/00, A61K35/28, A61K45/06 | [2017/18] | CPC: |
A61K31/519 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K35/28 (EP,IL,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,IL,US);
A61P11/00 (EP,IL);
A61P37/00 (EP,IL);
A61P37/06 (EP,IL,KR);
|
Former IPC [2016/41] | A61K31/519, A61K31/506, A61P37/00, A61P43/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/41] | Extension states | BA | 02.06.2016 | ME | 02.06.2016 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG UND PRÄVENTION VON ALLOANTIKÖRPER-GESTEUERTER CHRONISCHER TRANSPLANTAT-GEGEN-EMPFÄNGER-KRANKHEIT | [2016/41] | English: | METHODS OF TREATING AND PREVENTING ALLOANTIBODY DRIVEN CHRONIC GRAFT VERSUS HOST DISEASE | [2016/41] | French: | MÉTHODES DE TRAITEMENT ET DE PRÉVENTION DE LA MALADIE CHRONIQUE DU GREFFON CONTRE L'HÔTE CAUSÉE PAR LES ALLOANTICORPS | [2016/41] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 02.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/41] | 30.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.03.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 11.03.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.03.2024 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 17.04.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 17.04.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.04.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 10.08.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 10.08.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.08.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 24.04.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 24.04.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.05.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2015061751 (PHARMACYCLICS INC [US], et al); | International search | [A]US2012071497 (BUGGY JOSEPH J [US], et al); | [X]US8476284 (HONIGBERG LEE [US], et al); |