EP3096044 - PISTON RING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Riken 8-1, Sanbancho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-8202 / JP | [2016/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKAZAKI, Fumihiro c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Riken Kashiwazaki Plant 1-37 Hokuto-cho Kashiwazaki-shi Niigata 945-8555 / JP | 02 /
FUJITA, Masaaki c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Riken Kashiwazaki Plant 1-37 Hokuto-cho Kashiwazaki-shi Niigata 945-8555 / JP | [2016/47] | Representative(s) | Luten, Martin Haaije, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2016/47] | Application number, filing date | 14869995.2 | 26.12.2014 | [2016/47] | WO2014JP84528 | Priority number, date | deleted | [2017/07] |
Former [2016/47] | JP20130256792 | 12.12.2013 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015088047 | Date: | 18.06.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3096044 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16J9/16, F02F5/00 | [2016/47] | CPC: |
F16J9/14 (EP,US);
F02F5/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/47] | Title | German: | KOLBENRING | [2016/47] | English: | PISTON RING | [2016/47] | French: | SEGMENT DE PISTON | [2016/47] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2016 | Translation filed | 07.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2016 | Search fee paid | 07.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.12.2014 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 07.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/47] | 13.10.2016 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001 | 05.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/11] | 16.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US1532547 (ERNEST PRUYN JOHN) [X] 1,3-5 * the whole document * [I] 2; | [XI]DE3149455 (TOKICO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4 * page 7, line 5 - line 32; figures 3,5-7 * [I] 5; | [I]EP2119944 (NOK CORP [JP]) [I] 1-5 * column 9, paragraph 0048; figure 5 *; | [XI]US2004046329 (PIETERS KOEN [BE]) [X] 1,3,4 * the whole document * [I] 2,5 | International search | [X]JPS6384459U (EAGLE KOGYO CO., LTD.); | [Y]JPH0674339 (NIPPON PISTON RING CO LTD, et al); | [Y]JPH04119665U (RIKEN CORP.); | [Y]JPS59126158U (RIKEN CORP.); | [A]JPH0361681 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]US2846281 (ELEMER SZIGETI) | by applicant | JPS59126158U | JPH0441153U | JP2003001584 |