EP3038773 - WELLBORE ISOLATION DEVICE MADE FROM A POWDERED FUSIBLE ALLOY MATRIX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. 10200 Bellaire Boulevard Houston, TX 77072 / US | [2016/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURPHREE, Zachary, R. 2601 Beltline Road Carrollton, TX 75006 / US | 02 /
FRIPP, Michael, L. 2601 Beltline Road Carrollton, TX 75006 / US | 03 /
WALTON, Zachary, W. 2601 Beltline Road Carrollton, TX 75006 / US | [2016/27] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/27] | Application number, filing date | 14870921.5 | 25.09.2014 | [2016/27] | WO2014US57556 | Priority number, date | US201314136932 | 20.12.2013 Original published format: US201314136932 | [2016/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015094449 | Date: | 25.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3038773 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C22C1/04, C22C32/00 | [2017/18] | CPC: |
C22C32/0094 (EP);
C22C1/04 (EP);
C22C1/0483 (EP);
C22C1/05 (EP);
C22C12/00 (EP);
C22C32/0089 (EP);
B22F2998/10 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/10, B22F9/082, B22F3/04, B22F3/1035 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2016/27] | B22F3/12, E21B21/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/27] | Title | German: | BOHRLOCHISOLIERVORRICHTUNG AUS EINER PULVERFÖRMIGEN SCHMELZBAREN LEGIERUNGSMATRIX | [2016/27] | English: | WELLBORE ISOLATION DEVICE MADE FROM A POWDERED FUSIBLE ALLOY MATRIX | [2016/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ISOLATION DE FORAGE FABRIQUÉ À PARTIR D'UNE MATRICE D'ALLIAGE FUSIBLE PULVÉRULENTE | [2016/27] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/27] | 31.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.12.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/25] | 21.03.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/25] | Appeal following examination | 22.02.2021 | Appeal received No. T0704/21 | 22.02.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 22.04.2021 | Statement of grounds filed | 21.03.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 26.04.2023 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 21.03.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | EP23162882.7 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2009226340 (MARYA MANUEL [US]) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0026] , [0 34] , [0037] , [0040] , [0057] - [0062] * * claims 19-23 *; | [A]US2013333890 (DAGENAIS PETE [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0035] * * claims 1-3, 7, 8 ** figures 1-4 * | International search | [A]US5561829 (SAWTELL RALPH R [US], et al); | [A]US2002056553 (DUHON MARK C [US], et al); | [A]US2006175703 (GODIJN PAUL W [NL], et al); | [A]US7350582 (MCKEACHNIE W JOHN [US], et al); | [A]US2013327540 (HAMID SYED [US], et al) | by applicant | US2009226310 | US2013333890 |