EP3082395 - A VEGETATION CUTTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Slasher Teck Ltd PO Box 752 Merimbula, New South Wales 2548 / AU | [2016/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOYLE, Nathan PO Box 752 Merimbula, New South Wales 2548 / AU | 02 /
BOYLE, Norm PO Box 752 Merimbula, New South Wales 2548 / AU | [2016/43] | Representative(s) | Treeby, Philip David William, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/45] | Treeby, Philip David William, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2016/43] | Treeby, Philip David William, et al RGC Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14871237.5 | 19.12.2014 | [2016/43] | WO2014AU50437 | Priority number, date | AU20130905001 | 20.12.2013 Original published format: AU 2013905001 | [2016/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015089588 | Date: | 25.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3082395 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3082395 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 25.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/66, A01D34/63, A01D34/412, A01D101/00 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
A01D34/863 (EP,US);
A01D34/84 (US);
A01D34/664 (US);
A01D34/81 (EP,US);
A01D34/828 (US);
A01D2101/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VEGETATIONSSCHNEIDER | [2016/43] | English: | A VEGETATION CUTTER | [2016/43] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE COUPE DE VÉGÉTATION | [2016/43] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2016 | Search fee paid | 11.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 11.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/43] | 24.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.12.2014 | AL | 04.11.2020 | AT | 04.11.2020 | CY | 04.11.2020 | CZ | 04.11.2020 | DK | 04.11.2020 | EE | 04.11.2020 | ES | 04.11.2020 | FI | 04.11.2020 | HR | 04.11.2020 | LT | 04.11.2020 | LV | 04.11.2020 | MC | 04.11.2020 | MK | 04.11.2020 | MT | 04.11.2020 | PL | 04.11.2020 | RO | 04.11.2020 | RS | 04.11.2020 | SI | 04.11.2020 | SK | 04.11.2020 | SM | 04.11.2020 | LU | 19.12.2020 | BG | 04.02.2021 | NO | 04.02.2021 | GR | 05.02.2021 | IS | 04.03.2021 | PT | 04.03.2021 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 19.12.2014 | |
AL | 04.11.2020 | ||
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CY | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
MT | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
LU | 19.12.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
LU | 19.12.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
LU | 19.12.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
LU | 19.12.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
LU | 19.12.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 04.11.2020 | |
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 04.11.2020 | |
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 04.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3241302 (BARRY ROBERT O) [X] 1,4-8,15 * figures 1,4 * * column 2, line 13 - column 9, line 18 * [I] 9-14; | [A]DE4233020 (PLASCHKE HERBERT [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US5704201 (VAN VLEET ROBERT D [US]) [X] 1,4-8,15 * figures 1,3,5-7G * * column 2, line 44 - column 7, line 63 *; | [X]US6622466 (ETHIER ALBERT [CA]) [X] 1-8,15 * figures 1,2,4a-4c,5a * * column 3, line 44 - column 6, line 6 *; | [A]US2006026938 (CARTNER JACK O [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document * | International search | [X]US3241302 (BARRY ROBERT O); | [X]US3535861 (FINEMAN ABRAHAM); | [X]US5704201 (VAN VLEET ROBERT D [US]); | [X]DK2189054T (BAWI TEC GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | US3241302 | US5704201 | US6622466 |