EP3084702 - A SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ENHANCED TOKEN-BASED PAYMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Capital One Financial Corporation 1680 Capital One Drive McLean VA 22102 / US | [2016/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NICZYPORUK, Janusz, Michael 105 Shepherdson Lane NE Vienna, VA 22180 / US | 02 /
POOLE, Thomas, S. 13799 Necklace Court Chantilly, VA 20151 / US | 03 /
MORETON, Paul, Young 11916 Brookmeade Court Glen Allen, VA 23059 / US | [2016/43] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/43] | Leonhard, Frank Reimund Leonhard & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 09 62 80083 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14871567.5 | 18.12.2014 | [2016/43] | WO2014US71152 | Priority number, date | US201314132508 | 18.12.2013 Original published format: US201314132508 | [2016/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015095517 | Date: | 25.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3084702 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/40, G06Q30/06, H04L29/06, G06Q20/02, G06Q20/32, G06Q30/02, G06Q50/00, G06Q20/20, G06Q20/38, H04W4/00 | [2017/46] | CPC: |
G06Q20/38215 (EP);
G06Q20/02 (EP);
G06Q20/204 (EP);
G06Q20/3224 (EP);
G06Q20/3227 (EP);
G06Q20/3229 (EP);
G06Q20/326 (EP);
G06Q20/3278 (EP);
G06Q20/384 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2016/46] | G06Q20/40, G06Q30/06, H04L29/06 | ||
Former IPC [2016/43] | G06Q20/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/43] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR ERWEITERTE TOKEN-BASIERTE ZAHLUNGEN | [2016/43] | English: | A SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ENHANCED TOKEN-BASED PAYMENTS | [2016/43] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'AMÉLIORATION DE PAIEMENTS BASÉS SUR UN JETON | [2016/43] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 23.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/43] | 25.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/27] | 22.06.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US2013124346 (BALDWIN CHRISTOPHER F [US], et al); | [Y]US2013212019 (MATTSSON ULF [US], et al); | [Y]US8533123 (HART ANNMARIE D [US]); | [Y]US2013311375 (PRIEBATSCH SETH [US]); | [Y]US8595800 (ROBINSON TIMOTHY L [US], et al) |