EP3085909 - EXHAUST CONTROL SYSTEM FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/43] | EXHAUST GAS PURIFICATION SYSTEM FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | ||
[2017/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi, 471-8571 / JP | [2018/05] |
Former [2016/43] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAGIMOTO, Taiga c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
KOGO, Tomoyuki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
MATSUMOTO, Arifumi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
FURUI, Kenji c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 05 /
UOZUMI, Akifumi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2016/43] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/05] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2016/43] | Smith, Samuel Leonard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14872025.3 | 19.12.2014 | [2016/43] | WO2014JP83760 | Priority number, date | JP20130263030 | 19.12.2013 Original published format: JP 2013263030 | [2016/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015093603 | Date: | 25.06.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3085909 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3085909 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/20, F01N3/035, F01N3/02, F01N11/00, B01D53/94 | [2017/33] | CPC: |
F01N11/00 (EP,US);
B01D53/9418 (EP,US);
B01D53/9477 (EP,US);
B01D53/9495 (EP,US);
F01N3/035 (EP,US);
F01N3/103 (EP,US);
F01N3/106 (EP,US);
F01N3/2066 (EP,US);
F01N9/002 (US);
B01D2251/2062 (EP,US);
B01D2251/2067 (EP,US);
F01N2250/02 (US);
F01N2550/02 (EP,US);
F01N2550/04 (EP,US);
F01N2560/026 (EP,US);
F01N2560/05 (EP,US);
F01N2560/14 (EP,US);
F01N2570/18 (EP,US);
F01N2610/02 (EP,US);
F01N2900/0412 (EP,US);
F01N2900/1402 (EP,US);
F01N2900/1606 (EP,US);
F01N2900/1621 (EP,US);
F01N3/36 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/43] | F01N3/023, B01D53/94, F01N3/00, F01N3/02, F01N3/08, F01N3/18, F01N3/24, F01N3/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABGASREINIGUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EINEN VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR | [2016/43] | English: | EXHAUST CONTROL SYSTEM FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2017/51] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PURIFICATION DES GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT POUR MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2016/43] |
Former [2016/43] | EXHAUST GAS PURIFICATION SYSTEM FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2016 | Translation filed | 13.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/43] | 19.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.12.2014 | AL | 31.01.2018 | AT | 31.01.2018 | CY | 31.01.2018 | CZ | 31.01.2018 | DK | 31.01.2018 | EE | 31.01.2018 | ES | 31.01.2018 | FI | 31.01.2018 | HR | 31.01.2018 | IT | 31.01.2018 | LT | 31.01.2018 | LV | 31.01.2018 | MC | 31.01.2018 | MK | 31.01.2018 | NL | 31.01.2018 | PL | 31.01.2018 | PT | 31.01.2018 | RO | 31.01.2018 | RS | 31.01.2018 | SE | 31.01.2018 | SI | 31.01.2018 | SK | 31.01.2018 | SM | 31.01.2018 | TR | 31.01.2018 | BG | 30.04.2018 | NO | 30.04.2018 | GR | 01.05.2018 | IS | 31.05.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PT | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
TR | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
TR | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 31.01.2018 | |
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 31.01.2018 | |
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | ES | 31.01.2018 | |
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | ES | 31.01.2018 | |
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | FI | 31.01.2018 | |
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010180580 (BOORSE R SAMUEL [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2012166833 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2011144977 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]US2012227377 (HOPKA MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | International search | [A]JP5288060B (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP.); | [A]JP2013181465 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2011241724 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) | by applicant | JP2013181465 | JP2008231978 | JP2007107465 | DE20091000286 |