EP3085593 - VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [2016/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERAYAMA Yoshito c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
ANDO Yoshinori c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 03 /
TSUKAMOTO Toshinori c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 04 /
NEGORO Masaki c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 05 /
FUJIMOTO Yoshikazu c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 06 /
NOGUCHI Masatoshi c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 07 /
SAKAGUCHI Yusuke c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2016/43] | Representative(s) | Beder, Jens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/43] | Beder, Jens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14872352.1 | 16.12.2014 | [2016/43] | WO2014JP83232 | Priority number, date | JP20130260105 | 17.12.2013 Original published format: JP 2013260105 | [2016/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015093464 | Date: | 25.06.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3085593 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60W10/08, B60K6/442, B60K6/52, B60K6/547, B60L11/18, B60W20/00, B60W30/02, B60L11/12, B60L11/14, B60W20/15, B60W20/11 | [2017/35] | CPC: |
B60L58/15 (EP,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,KR,US);
B60K17/356 (EP,US);
B60K6/365 (EP,US);
B60K6/387 (EP,US);
B60K6/442 (KR,US);
B60K6/448 (EP,US);
B60K6/52 (EP,KR,US);
B60K6/547 (EP,KR,US);
B60K7/0007 (EP,US);
B60L15/20 (KR);
B60L50/15 (EP,US);
B60L50/16 (EP,US);
B60L58/10 (KR);
B60L58/13 (EP,US);
B60W10/26 (EP,KR,US);
B60W20/00 (KR,US);
B60W20/11 (EP,US);
B60W30/02 (EP,KR,US);
B60K2005/006 (EP,US);
B60K2007/0038 (EP,US);
B60K2007/0092 (EP,US);
B60L2220/42 (EP,US);
B60L2240/423 (EP,US);
B60L2240/545 (EP,US);
B60L2260/28 (EP,US);
B60W2510/246 (EP,US);
B60W2510/305 (EP,US);
B60W2710/083 (EP,US);
B60W2710/244 (EP,US);
B60W2720/406 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,KR,US);
Y02T10/64 (US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (US);
Y02T10/72 (US);
Y10S903/906 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/43] | B60W10/08, B60K6/442, B60K6/52, B60K6/547, B60L11/18, B60W20/00, B60W30/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/43] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUG | [2016/43] | English: | VEHICLE | [2016/43] | French: | VÉHICULE | [2016/43] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2016 | Translation filed | 15.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2016 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/43] | 24.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005060076 (PHILLIPS ANTHONY MARK [US], et al) [A] 1-5* abstract *; | [A]JP2008143382 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]JP2013153594 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JP2000238549 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [Y]JP2007245995 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]WO2013005783 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | JPH05111111 | JP2007245896 | JP2011079379 | JP2013215017 |