EP3084512 - SEE-THROUGH EYEPIECE FOR HEAD WEARABLE DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.2023 [2023/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2017/45] |
Former [2016/43] | For all designated states Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAKMAKCI, Ozan 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 02 /
GUPTA, Anurag 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 03 /
MARTINEZ, Oscar A. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | [2016/43] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kurfürstendamm 54-55 10707 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/43] | Chettle, John Edward, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 14872384.4 | 25.11.2014 | [2016/43] | WO2014US67458 | Priority number, date | US201314135284 | 19.12.2013 Original published format: US201314135284 | [2016/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015094613 | Date: | 25.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3084512 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/02, G02B27/22, G02B27/01, // G02B5/30, G02B27/28, G02B27/14 | [2017/32] | CPC: |
G02B27/0172 (EP,US);
G02B1/18 (EP,US);
G02B5/30 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0118 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0123 (EP,US);
G02B27/144 (US);
G02B27/283 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/43] | G02B27/02, G02B27/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/43] | Title | German: | DURCHSICHTIGES OKULAR FÜR EINE AUF DEM KOPF TRAGBARE ANZEIGE | [2016/43] | English: | SEE-THROUGH EYEPIECE FOR HEAD WEARABLE DISPLAY | [2016/43] | French: | OCULAIRE TRANSPARENT DESTINÉ À UN AFFICHEUR POUVANT ÊTRE PORTÉ SUR LA TÊTE | [2016/43] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2016 | Search fee paid | 05.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/43] | 30.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/17] | 16.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0922985 (MIXED REALITY SYSTEMS LAB INC [JP]) [X] 1-6,13-15 * paragraphs [0014] , [0001]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0017] * * figure 6 * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028] * [I] 7-12; | [A]WO02088825 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 2* figure 1 *; | [X]US2011221656 (HADDICK JOHN D [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 4,5 * * paragraph [0146] - paragraph [0147] * | International search | [Y]US2012162549 (GAO ET AL.); | [Y]US2013033756 (SPITZER ET AL.); | [A]JP4550184B (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO., LTD.); | [A]US2002167733 (ROEST); | [A]KR100386725B (DAEYANG ENC CO., LTD.) | by applicant | EP0922985 | US2011221656 | WO02088825 |