EP3085632 - PRINTED FILM FOR VESSEL, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.2022 [2022/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyo Seikan Co., Ltd. 18-1 Higashi-Gotanda 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8640 / JP | [2016/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMADA, Kouji c/o Toyo Seikan Co. Ltd. Technical Headquarters 1-70 Yako 1-chome Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 230-0001 / JP | 02 /
SAITOU, Yukiko c/o Toyo Seikan Co. Ltd. Technical Headquarters 1-70 Yako 1-chome Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 230-0001 / JP | 03 /
YUKAWA, Yasuhiro c/o Toyo Seikan Co. Ltd. Technical Headquarters 1-70 Yako 1-chome Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 230-0001 / JP | [2016/43] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/43] | Raynor, Stuart Andrew J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14872547.6 | 12.12.2014 | [2016/43] | WO2014JP82991 | Priority number, date | JP20130260065 | 17.12.2013 Original published format: JP 2013260065 | JP20140001413 | 08.01.2014 Original published format: JP 2014001413 | [2016/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015093405 | Date: | 25.06.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3085632 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B41M1/30, B32B7/12, B41M5/00, // B65D25/36, B44C1/10 | [2020/08] | CPC: |
B32B7/12 (EP,US);
B41M3/008 (US);
B32B37/12 (US);
B32B38/14 (US);
B41F9/003 (US);
B41J2/01 (US);
B41M1/10 (US);
B41M1/30 (EP,US);
B41M5/0047 (EP,US);
B41M5/0064 (EP,US);
B32B2307/4026 (EP,US);
B32B2307/412 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/33] | B41M5/00, B41M1/30, B41M3/00, B32B7/12, B65D25/36 | ||
Former IPC [2016/43] | B65D8/00, B32B1/02, B32B1/08, B41M5/00, B41M5/50, B41M5/52, B65D25/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/43] | Title | German: | BEDRUCKTE FOLIE FÜR BEHÄLTER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2016/43] | English: | PRINTED FILM FOR VESSEL, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2016/43] | French: | FILM IMPRIMÉ POUR RÉCIPIENT ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2016/43] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2016 | Translation filed | 26.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2016 | Search fee paid | 26.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/43] | 18.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/03] | 31.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2006151993 (NEMETH JOSHUA R [AU]) | International search | [A]JP2000095248 (DAIWA CAN CO LTD); | [Y]JP2003335337 (DAIWA CAN CO LTD); | [Y]JP2005001676 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD); | [A]JP2005296418 (HAKUEISHA KK, et al); | [Y]WO2013115302 (TOYO SEIKAN GROUP HOLDINGS LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2005059458 |