EP3085790 - METHOD FOR THE MICROBIOLOGICAL DETERMINATION OF TRACES OF ANTIBIOTICS IN LOW VOLUME BIOLOGICAL SAMPLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universidad De Santiago De Chile Avenida Libertador Bernardo 0'Higgins 3363 Estacion Central Santiago / CL | [2016/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANHUEZA CHAVEZ, Loreto Av. Libertador Bernardo O'Higgins 3363 Estación Central Santiago / CL | 02 /
WILKENS ANWANDTER, Marcela Andrea Av. Libertador Bernardo O'Higgins 3363 Estación Central Santiago / CL | 03 /
LAURIDO FUENZALIDA, Claudio Aurelio Av. Libertador Bernardo O'Higgins 3363 Estación Central Santiago / CL | [2016/43] | Representative(s) | Isern Patentes y Marcas S.L. C/Príncipe de Vergara 43, 6 planta 28001 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2018/35] | Isern Patentes y Marcas S.L. Paseo de la Castellana 115, 1° dcha 28046 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2016/43] | Isern-Jara, Nuria J. Isern Patentes y Marcas Avda. Diagonal 463 Bis 2° 08036 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 14872796.9 | 11.12.2014 | [2016/43] | WO2014CL00072 | Priority number, date | CL20130003628 | 18.12.2013 Original published format: CL 2013003628 | [2016/43] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015089683 | Date: | 25.06.2015 | Language: | ES | [2015/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3085790 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3085790 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CL | 25.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/02, C12Q1/18, C12R1/445 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
C12Q1/18 (EP,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
G01N2333/31 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MIKROBIOLOGISCHEN BESTIMMUNG VON SPUREN VON ANTIBIOTIKA IN BIOLOGISCHEN PROBEN MIT GERINGEM VOLUMEN | [2016/43] | English: | METHOD FOR THE MICROBIOLOGICAL DETERMINATION OF TRACES OF ANTIBIOTICS IN LOW VOLUME BIOLOGICAL SAMPLES | [2016/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION MICROBIOLOGIQUE DE TRACES D'ANTIBIOTIQUES DANS DES ÉCHANTILLONS BIOLOGIQUES DE FAIBLE VOLUME | [2016/43] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2016 | Translation filed | 06.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2016 | Search fee paid | 06.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/43] | 11.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 19.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.12.2014 | AL | 29.08.2018 | AT | 29.08.2018 | CY | 29.08.2018 | CZ | 29.08.2018 | DK | 29.08.2018 | EE | 29.08.2018 | ES | 29.08.2018 | FI | 29.08.2018 | HR | 29.08.2018 | IT | 29.08.2018 | LT | 29.08.2018 | LV | 29.08.2018 | MC | 29.08.2018 | MK | 29.08.2018 | NL | 29.08.2018 | PL | 29.08.2018 | PT | 29.08.2018 | RO | 29.08.2018 | RS | 29.08.2018 | SE | 29.08.2018 | SI | 29.08.2018 | SK | 29.08.2018 | SM | 29.08.2018 | TR | 29.08.2018 | BG | 29.11.2018 | NO | 29.11.2018 | GR | 30.11.2018 | GB | 11.12.2018 | IE | 11.12.2018 | LU | 11.12.2018 | MT | 11.12.2018 | IS | 29.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PT | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
GB | 11.12.2018 | ||
IE | 11.12.2018 | ||
LU | 11.12.2018 | ||
MT | 11.12.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
GB | 11.12.2018 | ||
IE | 11.12.2018 | ||
LU | 11.12.2018 | ||
MT | 11.12.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
GB | 11.12.2018 | ||
IE | 11.12.2018 | ||
LU | 11.12.2018 | ||
MT | 11.12.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
GB | 11.12.2018 | ||
IE | 11.12.2018 | ||
LU | 11.12.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
GB | 11.12.2018 | ||
IE | 11.12.2018 | ||
LU | 11.12.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IE | 11.12.2018 | ||
LU | 11.12.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IE | 11.12.2018 | ||
LU | 11.12.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LU | 11.12.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LU | 11.12.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 29.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0418113 (ORGENICS LTD [IL]) [AD] 1-3 * page 3, line 13 - line 37 *; | [A]WO2005108626 (REPLIDYNE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * example 3 *; | [A] - Eucast ET AL, "Determination of minimum inhibitory concentrations (MICs) of antibacterial agents by broth dilution", Clinical Microbiology and Infection, (20030801), pages 1 - 7, URL: http://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/store/10.1046/j.1469-0691.2003.00790.x/asset/j.1469-0691.2003.00790.x.pdf?v=1&t=j2a4xfoi&s=9a7ad466b2b8af7e730cc128b6b597ba8d30d1e9, (20170504), XP055369300 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * | [A] - T.O. OMOTADE ET AL, "D-cycloserine or similar physiochemical compounds may be uniquely suited for use in Bacillus anthracis spore decontamination strategies", JOURNAL OF APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY., GB, (20130830), vol. 115, no. 6, doi:10.1111/jam.12322, ISSN 1364-5072, pages 1343 - 1356, XP055369346 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * * page 46, column l, line 13 - page 47, column r, line 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/jam.12322 | International search | [Y] - EDBERG S. C. ET AL., "Turbidimetric determination of blood amino glycoside levels by growth curve analysis.", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (1980), vol. 69, no. 12, pages 1442 - 1443, XP055353000 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600691226 | [Y] - WHYATT P. L. ET AL., "Rapid, Precise, Turbidometric Assay for Low Levels of Ampicillin in Serum After Single-Dose Oral Administration.", ANTIMICROB AGENTS CHEMOTHER., (1974), vol. 6, no. 6, pages 811 - 814, XP055353001 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AAC.6.6.811 | [Y] - EDBERG, S. C., "Determination of antibiotics levels in human body fluids: techniques and significance bactericidal tests in endo carditis and other severe infections.", ANTIBIOTICS IN LABORATORY MEDICINE., USA, (1980), vol. 206-264, pages 225 - 228 | [A] - LOURENÇO F. R. ET AL., "Antibiotic microbial assay using kinetic-reading microplate system.", BRAZILIAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (2011), vol. 47, no. 3, pages 573 - 584, XP055353004 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1590/S1984-82502011000300015 | [A] - ØSTERGAARD C. ET AL., "Evaluation of Moxifloxacin, a New 8-Methoxyquinolone, for Treatment of Meningitis Caused by a Penicillin Resistant Pneumococcus in Rabbits.", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (1998), vol. 42, no. 7, pages 1706 - 1712, XP055353005 | by applicant | EP0418113 | CN1858232 | - S. FAINE; D.C. KNIGHT, "Rapid microbiological assay of antibiotics in blood and other body fluids", THE LANCET, (19680817), pages 375 - 378 | - MARIE-HELENE LE BRETON; MARIE-CLAUDE SAVOY-PERROUD; JEAN-MARC DISERENS, ANALYTICA CHIMICA ACTA, (2007), vol. 586, no. 1-2, pages 280 - 283 | - ANDRES F. ZULUAGA; MARIA AGUDELO; CARLOS RODRIGUEZ; OMAR VESGA, BMC CLINICAL PHARMACOLOGY, (2009), vol. 9, page 1 |