EP3079088 - USER BEHAVIOR SAFETY MONITORING METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.01.2018 [2018/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2016/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEI, He Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
HUANG, Kangmin Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2016/41] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [2016/41] | Application number, filing date | 14873509.5 | 18.11.2014 | [2016/41] | WO2014CN91412 | Priority number, date | CN20131720012 | 23.12.2013 Original published format: CN201310720012 | [2016/41] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015096567 | Date: | 02.07.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3079088 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2016/41] | CPC: |
G16H50/20 (EP,US);
G16H20/30 (EP,US);
G16H40/67 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/41] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DER BENUTZERVERHALTENSSICHERHEIT | [2016/41] | English: | USER BEHAVIOR SAFETY MONITORING METHOD AND DEVICE | [2016/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE DE SÉCURITÉ DE COMPORTEMENT D'UTILISATEUR | [2016/41] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2016 | Translation filed | 04.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2016 | Search fee paid | 04.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/41] | 14.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/03] | 29.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2013097110 (KWON OH BYUNG [KR]) [X] 1-22 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 14] , [0 22] , [0 42] , [0 45] , [0 46] - [0050] *; | [X]US2013325404 (YUEN SHELTEN GEE JAO [US], et al) [X] 1-22 * paragraphs [0022] , [0 23] , [ 113] , [ 155] , [ 394] , [ 482]; claim 1 *; | [A]US2009322513 (HWANG FRANKLIN DUN-JEN [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * paragraphs [0010] , [0 12] , [0 17] , [0 18] , [0 22] * | International search | [X]CN202282004U (SHANGHAI JULANG INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [A]CN102835958 (SHANDONG PULAITE RES INST OF ENERGY & ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE); | [XP]CN103714249 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) |