EP3121236 - CURABLE SILICON RUBBER COMPOSITION FOR LED PACKAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elkem Silicones Shanghai Co., Ltd. 3966 Jin Du Road Xin Zhuang Industrial Zone Minhang District Shanghai 201108 / CN | [2021/17] |
Former [2021/10] | For all designated states Bluestar Silicones Shanghai Co., Ltd. 3966 Jin Du Rd. Xin Zhuang Industrial Zone Minhang District Shanghai 201108 / CN | ||
Former [2017/04] | For all designated states Bluestar Silicones Shanghai Co. Ltd. 3966 Jin Du Rd. Xin Zhuang Industrial Zone Minhang District Shanghai 201108 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIA, Liya 3966 Jin Du Rd. Xin Zhuang Industrial Zone Minhang District Shanghai 201108 / CN | 02 /
ZHAO, Shifang 3966 Jin Du Rd. Xin Zhuang Industrial Zone Minhang District Shanghai 201108 / CN | 03 /
YANG, Yili 3966 Jin Du Rd. Xin Zhuang Industrial Zone Minhang District Shanghai 201108 / CN | [2017/04] | Representative(s) | Mekki, Boualem, et al Elkem Silicones France SAS 9, rue Spécia 69190 Saint-Fons / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/28] | Mekki, Boualem, et al Elkem Silicones France SAS Industrial Property Department 55, rue des Frères Perret 69192 Saint Fons / FR | ||
Former [2017/04] | Mekki, Boualem Bluestar Silicones France Dépt. Brevets - Bât. 77 55, avenue des Frères Perret 69190 Saint-Fons / FR | Application number, filing date | 14873808.1 | 20.11.2014 | [2017/04] | WO2014CN91734 | Priority number, date | CN201310737774 | 27.12.2013 Original published format: CN201310737774 | [2017/04] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015096570 | Date: | 02.07.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3121236 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3121236 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C09J183/07, C09J183/05, C09J11/06, H01L33/56 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
C08L83/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08G77/08 (KR);
C08K5/34924 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/56 (EP,KR,US);
C08L83/00 (EP,KR,US);
H01L33/56 (EP,KR,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L83/04, C08L83/00, C08L83/00, C08K5/56, C08K5/34924 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HÄRTBARE SILICIUMKAUTSCHUKZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR LED-GEHÄUSE | [2017/04] | English: | CURABLE SILICON RUBBER COMPOSITION FOR LED PACKAGING | [2017/04] | French: | COMPOSITION DE CAOUTCHOUC SILICONE DURCISSABLE POUR MISE EN BOÎTIER DE LED | [2017/04] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2016 | Translation filed | 11.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 11.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 11.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/04] | 11.07.2016 | Examination requested [2017/04] | 10.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2017/04] | 01.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/25] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 05.12.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 05.12.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.12.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.11.2014 | AL | 14.07.2021 | AT | 14.07.2021 | CY | 14.07.2021 | CZ | 14.07.2021 | EE | 14.07.2021 | ES | 14.07.2021 | FI | 14.07.2021 | HR | 14.07.2021 | IT | 14.07.2021 | LT | 14.07.2021 | LV | 14.07.2021 | MC | 14.07.2021 | MK | 14.07.2021 | PL | 14.07.2021 | RO | 14.07.2021 | RS | 14.07.2021 | SI | 14.07.2021 | SK | 14.07.2021 | SM | 14.07.2021 | BG | 14.10.2021 | NO | 14.10.2021 | GR | 15.10.2021 | IS | 14.11.2021 | PT | 15.11.2021 | IE | 20.11.2021 | LU | 20.11.2021 | CH | 30.11.2021 | LI | 30.11.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/30] | HU | 20.11.2014 | |
AL | 14.07.2021 | ||
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CY | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
IE | 20.11.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 20.11.2014 | |
AL | 14.07.2021 | ||
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
IE | 20.11.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
IE | 20.11.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4340710 (BROWN JR EDGAR D) [X] 1-7,9-17 * example 1 * * column 6, line 61 * * column 8, line 40 *[I] 8 | International search | [X]CN101671483 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO); | [A]CN101921488 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO); | [A]US2011147955 (KASHIWAGI TSUTOMU [JP]); | [A]EP2497802 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) | Examination | JP2011208120 | by applicant | US3159601 | US3159602 | US3220972 | US3377432 | US3419593 | US3715334 | US3814730 | EP0057459 | EP0188978 | EP0190530 | CN101935455 | WO2011117230 |